EP3792690 - LIGHT SOURCE SYSTEM, PROJECTION DEVICE AND ILLUMINATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.08.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Appotronics Corporation Limited 20F-22F, Sudandan High-Tech Zone Union Tower No.63, Xuefu Road Yuehai Street, Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUO, Zuqiang 20F-22F High-Tech Zone Union Tower No.63 Xuefu Road, Yuehai Street Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 02 /
DU, Peng 20F-22F High-Tech Zone Union Tower No.63 Xuefu Road, Yuehai Street Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | 03 /
LU, Ning 20F-22F High-Tech Zone Union Tower No.63 Xuefu Road, Yuehai Street Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Zaboliene, Reda Metida Business center Vertas Gyneju str. 16 01109 Vilnius / LT | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19800781.7 | 05.01.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019CN70523 | Priority number, date | CN201810444994 | 10.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810444994 | [2021/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019214273 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792690 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3792690 | Date: | 30.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G03B21/20, G03B21/00, G03B33/08 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
G03B21/204 (EP,CN);
G03B21/2013 (EP);
G03B21/2066 (EP,CN);
G03B21/2073 (EP);
G03B21/208 (CN);
G03B33/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | G03B21/20, G03B21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LICHTQUELLENSYSTEM, PROJEKTIONSVORRICHTUNG UND BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/11] | English: | LIGHT SOURCE SYSTEM, PROJECTION DEVICE AND ILLUMINATION DEVICE | [2021/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SOURCE DE LUMIÈRE, DISPOSITIF DE PROJECTION ET DISPOSITIF D'ÉCLAIRAGE | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2020 | Translation filed | 10.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 26.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2793079 (APPOTRONICS CORP LTD [CN]); | [YA]EP2898368 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP2939070 (RICOH CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US9599316 (YAMADA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) | International search | [A]CN205982969U (YILI RUIGUANG TECH DEV (SHENZHEN) CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * description, paragraphs 61-84, and figures 3-6 *; | [A]CN107621744 (APPOTRONICS CORP LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN104749867 (HISENSE GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]JP2015161801 (RICOH CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document * |