EP3790553 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING CD20 INHIBITORS AND BISFLUOROALKYL-1,4-BENZODIAZEPINONE COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ayala Pharmaceuticals Inc. 1007 North Orange Street 4th Floor Wilmington, DE 19802 / US | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAMLUK, Roni 3 Gefen 7684703 Mazkeret Batya / IL | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Baratz UK LLP The Gridiron Building One Pancras Square London N1C 4AG / GB | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19800858.3 | 06.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019IB53696 | Priority number, date | US201862667540P | 06.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862667540 P | US201862720941P | 22.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862720941 P | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215585 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3790553 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5513, A61K39/395, A61K31/661, A61K35/17, A61P35/00, A61K45/06 | [2022/16] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61K31/5513 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (EP,US);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K39/39558 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/5513, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K39/39558, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K45/06, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | A61K31/5513, A61K39/395, A61K31/661, A61K35/17, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | CD20-INHIBITOREN UND BISFLUORALKYL-1,4-BENZODIAZEPINONVERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTENDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/11] | English: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING CD20 INHIBITORS AND BISFLUOROALKYL-1,4-BENZODIAZEPINONE COMPOUNDS AND METHODS OF USE THEREOF | [2021/11] | French: | COMPOSITIONS COMPRENANT DES INHIBITEURS DE CD20 ET DES COMPOSÉS DE BISFLUOROALKYL-1,4-BENZODIAZÉPINONE ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 24.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2014047372 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | International search | [Y]WO2012129353 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US], et al); | [Y]WO2014047372 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | [Y]WO2014047391 (BRISTOL MYERS SQUIBB CO [US]); | [XP]WO2018151836 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US]); | [XP]WO2018201056 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [XP]WO2018201051 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [E]WO2019094626 (HUTCHINSON FRED CANCER RES [US], et al); | by applicant | US8629136 | US9273014 |