EP3880314 - FIRE-EXTINGUISHING HOSE FOR A BATTERY COMPARTMENT OR A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, Rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDRE, Maxime Les Rapées 45220 CHATEAU-RENARD / FR | 02 /
BOSSARD, Eric 1 rue de Montgrillon 45210 LA SELLE EN HERMOY / FR | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19801027.4 | 12.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019EP81005 | Priority number, date | FR20180060416 | 12.11.2018 Original published format: FR 1860416 | [2021/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020099392 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880314 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3880314 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A62C3/07, A62C35/10, A62C3/16, A62C99/00, H01M10/60, H01M50/24, H01M50/249 | [2024/07] | CPC: |
A62C35/10 (EP);
H01M50/24 (EP,US);
A62C3/07 (EP);
A62C3/16 (EP);
A62C99/0018 (EP);
H01M50/249 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/38] | A62C3/07, A62C35/10, A62C3/16, A62C99/00, H01M10/60, H01M2/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | 04.06.2021 | TN | 04.06.2021 | Title | German: | FEUERLÖSCHSCHLAUCH FÜR EIN BATTERIEFACH ODER EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2021/38] | English: | FIRE-EXTINGUISHING HOSE FOR A BATTERY COMPARTMENT OR A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2021/38] | French: | TUYAU EXTINCTEUR POUR UN COMPARTIMENT BATTERIE OU UN VÉHICULE À MOTEUR | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 04.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US3827502 (LOCKWOOD F) [X] 1,5,13,15-18 * figure - * * figures 1,3,4 * * column 1, lines 28-30 * * column 2, lines 5-8, 16-23 * [Y] 2-4,9-12,19-26; | [YA]EP0094192 (CHUBB FIRE SECURITY LTD [GB]) [Y] 2 * figure - * * page 2, lines 1-18 * [A] 1; | [Y]WO2016033423 (FIRETRACE USA LLC [US]) [Y] 10-12,25,26* paragraph [0025] *; | [Y]US2016193489 (TANIGUCHI KENJI [JP], et al) [Y] 2-4,9,19-24 * figures 2,3,4,8 * * paragraph [Background Art] * * paragraphs [0049] - [0054] *; | [T] - ADEME, "Les différents gaz à effet de serres", URL: http://www.bilans-ges.ademe.fr/documentation/UPLOAD_DOC_FR/index.htm?prg.htm, (20190606), XP002791868 [T] * Ce document non daté indique des valeurs de PRG définies à des dates antérieures à la demande.;; table Tableau des principaux PRG à 100 ans * | Examination | WO2012140712 | CN105977521 | CN106099008 | CN206179920U | by applicant | WO9108022 |