EP3899662 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A MANUFACTURING PROCESS AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.04.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 18.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2021/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANTJES, Nicolaas Petrus Marcus P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 02 /
COX, Matthijs P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | 03 /
MENCHTCHIKOV, Boris 399 West Trimble Road San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 04 /
TABERY, Cyrus, Emil 399 West Trimble Road San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 05 /
ZHANG, Youping 399 West Trimble Road San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 06 /
ZOU, Yi 399 West Trimble Road San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 07 /
LIN, Chenxi 399 West Trimble Road San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 08 /
CHENG, Yana 399 West Trimble Road San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 09 /
HASTINGS, Simon, Philip, Spencer 399 West Trimble Road San Jose, CA 95131 / US | 10 /
GENIN, Maxime, Philippe, Frederic 399 West Trimble Road San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2021/43] | Representative(s) | ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [2021/43] | Application number, filing date | 19801044.9 | 14.11.2019 | [2021/43] | WO2019EP81282 | Priority number, date | EP20180214013 | 19.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18214013 | US201962802866P | 08.02.2019 Original published format: US 201962802866 P | [2021/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020126242 | Date: | 25.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3899662 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3899662 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20, G03F9/00 | [2021/43] | CPC: |
G03F7/70633 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70491 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/706837 (KR);
G03F7/706839 (KR);
G03F9/7046 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHRENS UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/43] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A MANUFACTURING PROCESS AND ASSOCIATED APPARATUSES | [2021/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN PROCESSUS DE FABRICATION ET APPAREILS ASSOCIÉS | [2022/12] |
Former [2021/43] | PROCÉDÉ DE CONTRÔLE D'UN PROCESSUS DE FABRICATION ET APPAREILS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/43] | 19.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2019 | AL | 01.06.2022 | AT | 01.06.2022 | CY | 01.06.2022 | CZ | 01.06.2022 | DK | 01.06.2022 | EE | 01.06.2022 | ES | 01.06.2022 | FI | 01.06.2022 | HR | 01.06.2022 | IT | 01.06.2022 | LT | 01.06.2022 | LV | 01.06.2022 | MC | 01.06.2022 | MK | 01.06.2022 | MT | 01.06.2022 | NL | 01.06.2022 | PL | 01.06.2022 | RO | 01.06.2022 | RS | 01.06.2022 | SE | 01.06.2022 | SK | 01.06.2022 | SM | 01.06.2022 | BG | 01.09.2022 | NO | 01.09.2022 | GR | 02.09.2022 | IS | 01.10.2022 | PT | 03.10.2022 | IE | 14.11.2022 | LU | 14.11.2022 | BE | 30.11.2022 | CH | 30.11.2022 | LI | 30.11.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 14.11.2019 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
MK | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 14.11.2019 | |
AL | 01.06.2022 | ||
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CY | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
IT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
BE | 30.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
IE | 14.11.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
LU | 14.11.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
CH | 30.11.2022 | ||
LI | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/31] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
MC | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
DK | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 01.06.2022 | |
AT | 01.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
IS | 01.10.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
CZ | 01.06.2022 | ||
EE | 01.06.2022 | ||
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RO | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
SK | 01.06.2022 | ||
SM | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
PT | 03.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
ES | 01.06.2022 | ||
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 01.06.2022 | |
FI | 01.06.2022 | ||
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
NL | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
PL | 01.06.2022 | ||
RS | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
HR | 01.06.2022 | ||
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
LV | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
BG | 01.09.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | ||
GR | 02.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 01.06.2022 | |
LT | 01.06.2022 | ||
SE | 01.06.2022 | ||
NO | 01.09.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013035888 (KANDEL DANIEL [IL], et al); | [A]WO2018072980 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]); | by applicant | US6952253 | WO2017060080 |