EP3864574 - AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE PLANNING AND PREDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 19.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Five AI Limited Kett House Station Road Cambridge CB1 2JH / GB | [2023/32] |
Former [2021/33] | For all designated states Five AI Limited Temple Studios, Temple Gate Temple Meads, Bristol BS1 6QA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAMOORTHY, Subramanian c/o FIVE AI LIMITED Temple Studios, Temple Gate Temple Meads Bristol BS1 6QA / GB | 02 /
LYONS, Simon c/o FIVE AI LIMITED Temple Studios, Temple Gate Temple Meads Bristol BS1 6QA / GB | 03 /
PENKOV, Svet c/o FIVE AI LIMITED Temple Studios, Temple Gate Temple Meads Bristol BS1 6QA / GB | 04 /
ANTONELLO, Morris c/o FIVE AI LIMITED Temple Studios, Temple Gate Temple Meads Bristol BS1 6QA / GB | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Woodhouse, Thomas Duncan Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 19801204.9 | 16.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019EP78062 | Priority number, date | GB20180016850 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: GB 201816850 | GB20180016852 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: GB 201816852 | GB20180016853 | 16.10.2018 Original published format: GB 201816853 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020079066 | Date: | 23.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3864574 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
G08G1/0116 (EP,KR,US);
B60W60/0011 (EP,KR);
B60W40/04 (EP,KR,US);
B60W50/0097 (EP,KR,US);
B60W60/0013 (US);
B60W60/0015 (US);
B60W60/0027 (EP,KR,US);
G05B13/027 (US);
G05B13/04 (US);
G06F18/214 (US);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06F18/29 (EP,KR);
G06F18/295 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP);
G06N3/045 (US);
G06N3/08 (EP,KR);
G06N5/045 (EP,KR);
G06N7/01 (EP,KR);
G06T7/20 (US);
G06V10/84 (EP,KR,US);
G06V20/54 (US);
G06V20/56 (EP,KR,US);
G08G1/0129 (US);
G08G1/164 (EP,KR);
H02J3/14 (EP,KR);
H04N7/183 (US);
B60W2050/0028 (KR);
B60W2050/005 (KR);
B60W2420/00 (KR);
B60W2540/30 (US);
B60W2554/4046 (US);
B60Y2400/30 (KR);
G06T2207/20081 (US);
G06T2207/20084 (US);
G06T2207/30236 (US);
G06T2207/30241 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | PLANUNG UND VORHERSAGE VON AUTONOMEM FAHRZEUG | [2021/33] | English: | AUTONOMOUS VEHICLE PLANNING AND PREDICTION | [2021/33] | French: | PLANIFICATION ET PRÉDICTION DU VÉHICULE AUTONOME | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 14.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | GB20180003292 | GB20180012658 |