EP3870939 - MEASUREMENT ASSEMBLY FOR DETERMINING THE FLOW THROUGH A PIPE SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/35] | MEASUREMENT DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE FLOW OF A FLUID FLOWING THROUGH A PIPE SECTION | ||
[2023/20] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sensus Spectrum LLC 637 Davis Drive Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states Sensus Spectrum, LLC 637 Davis Drive Morrisville, NC 27560 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERTRAM, Carsten Gödekeweg 15 30419 Hannover / DE | 02 /
PFEIFFER, Andreas Schipworden 4 30627 Hannover / DE | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Dr. Keller, Schwertfeger Partnerschaft mbB Westring 17 76829 Landau / DE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19801676.8 | 21.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019EP78484 | Priority number, date | DE201810126613 | 25.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018126613 | [2021/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020083805 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870939 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3870939 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/66, G01F1/667 | [2023/20] | CPC: |
G01F1/662 (EP,IL,RU,US);
G01F1/667 (EP,IL,RU,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/35] | G01F1/66 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MESSVORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES DURCHFLUSSES EINES DURCH EINEN ROHRABSCHNITT HINDURCHSTRÖMENDEN FLUIDS | [2021/35] | English: | MEASUREMENT ASSEMBLY FOR DETERMINING THE FLOW THROUGH A PIPE SECTION | [2023/20] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE MESURE POUR DÉTERMINER LE DÉBIT À TRAVERS UNE SECTION DE TUYAU | [2023/20] |
Former [2021/35] | MEASUREMENT DEVICE FOR DETERMINING THE FLOW OF A FLUID FLOWING THROUGH A PIPE SECTION | ||
Former [2021/35] | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE SERVANT A DÉFINIR LE DÉBIT D'UN FLUIDE TRAVERSANT UN TRONÇON DE TUBE | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 05.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.08.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 09.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2461403 (BAUMOEL JOSEPH); | [A]EP0036658 (FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]); | [XI]EP1967828 (HYDROMETER GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP2236994 (KAMSTRUP AS [DK]); | [A]EP2386836 (HYDROMETER GMBH [DE]); | [A]DE202013101798U (SICK AG [DE]); | [A]DE102014109772 (FLEXIM FLEXIBLE INDUSTRIEMESSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) | Examination | WO0045161 | DE102007058132 | JP2018077081 |