EP3883759 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURE OF A COMPOSITE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hexcel Composites Limited Ickleton Road Duxford, Cambridgeshire CB22 4QB / GB | [2023/10] |
Former [2021/39] | For all designated states Hexcel Composites Limited Ickleton Road Duxford, Cambridgeshire CB22 4QD / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARCIDIACONO, Marco c/o Hexcel Composites Limited Ickleton Road Duxford, Cambridgeshire CB22 4QB / GB | [2021/39] | Representative(s) | TLIP Limited Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/39] | TLIP Limited 14 King Street Leeds LS1 2HL / GB | Application number, filing date | 19801842.6 | 08.11.2019 | [2021/39] | WO2019EP80759 | Priority number, date | GB20180018937 | 21.11.2018 Original published format: GB 201818937 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020104221 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3883759 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/54, B29C70/38 | [2021/39] | CPC: |
B29C70/54 (EP,US);
B29C70/386 (EP,US);
B29K2307/04 (US);
B29K2309/08 (US);
B29L2031/085 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERBUNDSTOFFS | [2021/39] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURE OF A COMPOSITE MATERIAL | [2021/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN MATÉRIAU COMPOSITE | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 05.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 05.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]WO0232664 (FOSTER MILLER INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9-12,14-16,18-20 * In one example, one six inch wide, six inch long carbon fiber prepreg tape with unidirectional fibers was laid on a flat mandrel to form the first ply. The centerline of an ultrasonic horn with a one half inch wide beveled tip was oriented at an angle of approximately 30 degrees to the mandrel surface, energized to vibrate at a frequency of 40mHz, and brought to bear on the tape in multiple parallel passes to cover and debulk the entire surface. Passes of the horn were made in the direction of the fiber tows at a rate of approximately one inch per second. The horn was set at a booster factor of 1: 1,80% amplitude. Next, another six inch wide, six inch long carbon fiber prepreg tape with unidirectional fibers located 90 degrees from the orientation of the first ply was laid on the first ply to form the second ply in the stack of plies. The ultrasonic horn was again brought to bear at an angle on the tape and moved over the second ply in the direction of the fiber tows to at least partially consolidate the first ply to the second ply and to debulk the lay-up consisting of the two plies. The ultrasonic horn is disposed as shown in Fig. 1. The energy level applied by the angled horn to the prepreg material was sufficient to reduce the viscosity of the thermosetting resin in each piece of tape of the two plies for at least partial consolidation and debulking but not high enough to cause full chemical cross linking of the resin which would inhibit the ability to lay-up another ply and eventually chemically cross link the resin in that ply to the resin in lower plies in the stack. A roller was configured to closely follow the horn to assist in the debulking process as shown in Fig. 2; page 12, paragraphs 2-4 * [A] 17 [Y] 7 [I] 3,8,13; | [A]WO2006042251 (BELL HELICOPTER TEXTRON INC [US], et al) [A] 1* figure 1 *; | [XY]US2014033653 (CHAM PAK MENG [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 9; claim 7 * [Y] 7; | [X]EP3045489 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0073] *; | [X]WO2018088173 (IHI CORP [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0043] , [0047]; figures 5,6 * | by applicant | WO2013007263 |