EP3853953 - SWITCHING DEVICE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.11.2023 [2023/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Components Biberach GmbH Hans-Liebherr-Strasse 45 88400 Biberach/Riss / DE | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FENKER, Oliver An der Schlosshalde 3 88447 Warthausen / DE | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | Thoma, Michael Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2021/30] | Application number, filing date | 19801858.2 | 11.11.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019EP80817 | Priority number, date | DE201810130342 | 29.11.2018 Original published format: DE102018130342 | [2021/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020108968 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3853953 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/052, H05K7/14, H01R9/26, H02B1/20, H01R25/14 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
H02B1/052 (EP,US);
H02B1/205 (EP,US);
H01R9/2658 (EP);
H01R9/2675 (EP);
H05K7/1478 (EP);
H01R25/14 (EP,US);
H05K7/1474 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | SCHALTGERÄTEANORDNUNG | [2021/30] | English: | SWITCHING DEVICE ARRANGEMENT | [2021/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DISJONCTEURS | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 23.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/44] | 22.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB2166914 (WEIDMUELLER C A GMBH CO); | [XI]FR2658008 (LEGRAND SA [FR]); | [XI]DE10351479 (DOLD & SOEHNE KG E [DE]); | [XI]DE102006056554 (ERNI ELECTRONICS GMBH [DE]); | [A]WO2009030243 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]DE102014224989 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE19748429 | EP1258957 |