EP3881396 - BOARD TO BOARD CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY FOR HF SIGNAL TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huber+Suhner AG Degersheimerstrasse 14 9100 Herisau / CH | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEMPLINGER, Florian Rothausstrasse 13 8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | 02 /
WAGNER, Martin Hafenstrasse 13b 9323 Steinach / CH | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Rentsch Partner AG Kirchenweg 8 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Rentsch Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 203 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 19802168.5 | 12.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019EP80973 | Priority number, date | CH20180001389 | 12.11.2018 Original published format: CH 13892018 | CH20190001046 | 22.08.2019 Original published format: CH 10462019 | [2021/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020099374 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3881396 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01R12/70, H01R12/73, H01R13/6594, H01R24/50, H01R12/91, H01R24/54, H01R103/00 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
H01R12/7082 (EP,US);
H01R12/7005 (US);
H01R12/7052 (EP,US);
H01R12/73 (EP,US);
H01R13/6594 (EP,US);
H01R24/48 (US);
H01R24/50 (EP,US);
H01R24/542 (EP,US);
H01R12/51 (US);
H01R12/53 (US);
H01R12/91 (EP,US);
H01R13/6591 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | BOARD-TO-BOARD-STECKVERBINDERANORDNUNG ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON HF-SIGNAL | [2021/38] | English: | BOARD TO BOARD CONNECTOR ASSEMBLY FOR HF SIGNAL TRANSMISSION | [2021/38] | French: | ENSEMBLE CONNECTEUR DE CARTE À CARTE POUR TRANSMISSION DE SIGNAL HF | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 13.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 13.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 17.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | 17.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 17.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.03.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0793299 (DUNKEL OTTO GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,12 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012]; figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 5-11,13-26; | [A]US5791911 (FASANO BENJAMIN V [US], et al) [A] 17* column 8, line 21 - column 8, line 38 *; | [A]US5820390 (TAKAMOTO JUNJI [JP], et al) [A] 13 * column 3, line 16 - column 3, line 67; figure 1 *; | [XY]US6497579 (GARBINI CHRISTIAN [CH]) [X] 1-4,12 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 35; figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 5-11,13-26; | [Y]US2011039448 (STEIN CASEY ROY [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1,3 *; | [Y]CN202732640U (SHANXI HUADA COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 5-9,14,19-23 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0013]; figures 1,3 *; | [XY]US8801459 (MROWKA ECKHARD [CH]) [X] 1-4,12 * column 1, line 5 - column 5, line 33; figure 1 * [Y] 5-11,13-26; | [XY]US2015118904 (BAECHLE ERIK [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,12 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0042]; figure 1 * [Y] 5-11,13-26 | by applicant | US6951482 | US6994563 | US2008085632 | EP3198686 | USRE46958E | CH20180001389 |