blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news
blank News flashes
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3870082

EP3870082 - IMPLANTABLE MONITOR INTRODUCER DESIGN FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  27.04.2024
Database last updated on 05.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Cardiac Pacemakers, Inc.
4100 Hamline Avenue North
St. Paul, Minnesota 55112 / US
[2021/35]
Inventor(s)01 / CORNELIUS, Kathryn
527 Gilbert Rd
Hudson, Wisconsin 55016 / US
02 / STIEPER, David P.
6165 373rd Street
North Branch, Minnesota 55056 / US
 [2021/35]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12
10719 Berlin / DE
[2021/35]
Application number, filing date19802468.928.10.2019
[2021/35]
WO2019US58350
Priority number, dateUS201862751681P28.10.2018         Original published format: US 201862751681 P
[2021/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2020092241
Date:07.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3870082
Date:01.09.2021
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2021/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.05.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61B17/3209, A61B17/34
[2021/35]
CPC:
A61B17/32093 (EP); A61B17/3468 (EP,US); A61B17/00234 (US);
A61B2017/320056 (EP); A61B2560/04 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/35]
TitleGerman:GESTALTUNGSMERKMALE FÜR EINFÜHRVORRICHTUNG EINES IMPLANTIERBAREN MONITORS[2021/35]
English:IMPLANTABLE MONITOR INTRODUCER DESIGN FEATURES[2021/35]
French:CARACTÉRISTIQUES DE CONCEPTION D'INTRODUCTEUR DE MONITEUR IMPLANTABLE[2021/35]
Entry into regional phase19.04.2021National basic fee paid 
19.04.2021Designation fee(s) paid 
19.04.2021Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.04.2021Examination requested  [2021/35]
19.04.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
15.12.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.08.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
19.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
22.10.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XI]US2009182267  (PAINCHAUD GAETAN [FR], et al);
 [XI]US2010331868  (BARDY GUST H [US]);
 [XI]EP2967644  (MEDTRONIC INC [US]);
 [XI]WO2017180792  (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]);
 [XI]WO2017180791  (CARDIAC PACEMAKERS INC [US]);
 [XI]EP3263056  (BIOTRONIK SE & CO KG [DE])
ExaminationUS2010094252
 US2017049467
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.