EP3794815 - FLEXIBLE TELEVISION AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUK, Jihe IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-Gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Heesoo IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-Gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 03 /
JANG, Wonbin IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-Gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 04 /
CHOI, Gowoon IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-Gu Seoul 06772 / KR | 05 /
HWANGBO, Hanseok IP Center, LG Electronics Inc. 19, Yangjae-daero 11-gil Seocho-Gu Seoul 06772 / KR | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Frenkel, Matthias Alexander Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/12] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19802908.4 | 30.01.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019KR01253 | Priority number, date | US201862673138P | 18.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862673138 P | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019221365 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3794815 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/64, G09F9/30 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
G09G3/035 (EP,US);
G09G3/3208 (EP);
G09G3/3406 (EP);
G09G5/38 (US);
G09G2320/08 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP);
G09G2340/02 (EP);
G09G2340/04 (EP);
G09G2340/0407 (EP);
G09G2354/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | FLEXIBLES FERNSEHGERÄT UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/12] | English: | FLEXIBLE TELEVISION AND METHOD THEREOF | [2021/12] | French: | TÉLÉVISEUR FLEXIBLE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 13.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016306534 (WOO SOOG-YEONG [KR], et al) [X] 1-10* paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0186]; figures 1-22 * | International search | [A]US2013300682 (CHOI JAEHO [KR], et al) [A] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0027]-[0029]; and figure 3. *; | [Y]US2015220118 (KWAK JI-YEON [KR], et al) [Y] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0011], [0027], [0168]-[0169]; and figures 1, 3A. *; | [A]US2017127535 (SHIN PILSOON [KR], et al) [A] 1-22* See paragraph [0014]; and figure 2. *; | [A]US2017212607 (YOON SUNGHYE [KR]) [A] 1-22 * See paragraph [0015]; and figure 2. *; | [Y]US2018129250 (LA JIN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-22 * See paragraphs [0009]-[0011], [0139]; and claims 1, 3-7; and figures 6-7. * | by applicant | US2016306534 |