EP3810413 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FORMING PACKAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Graphic Packaging International, LLC 1500 Riveredge Parkway NW, Suite 100, 9th Floor Atlanta, GA 30328 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALSH, Joseph C. 5532 La Plata Circle Boulder, Colorado 80301 / US | 02 /
CONATSER, Robert L. 6769 Abundance Way Golden, Colorado 80403 / US | 03 /
BAXLEY, James 8448 Nelson Drive Arvada, Colorado 80005 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19804213.7 | 13.05.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019IB53950 | Priority number, date | US201862671032P | 14.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862671032 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019220321 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810413 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 21.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B31B50/64, B31B50/72, B31B50/10, B65D33/02, B31B50/26, B31B105/00, B31B120/40, B31B70/64, B29C65/18, B29C65/78, B29C65/00 | [2022/11] | CPC: |
B65D33/02 (EP);
B65D5/103 (US);
B29C65/18 (EP);
B29C65/242 (EP);
B29C65/787 (EP);
B29C66/0242 (EP);
B29C66/346 (EP);
B29C66/43121 (EP);
B29C66/81465 (EP);
B29C66/8161 (EP);
B29C66/83411 (EP);
B29C66/836 (EP);
B29C66/8511 (EP);
B31B70/645 (EP);
B31B70/648 (EP);
B65D5/3628 (US);
B65D5/4208 (US);
B65D5/606 (US);
B29C65/30 (EP);
B29C66/0044 (EP);
B29C66/71 (EP);
B29C66/723 (EP);
B29C66/8122 (EP);
B29C66/834 (EP);
B29C66/91212 (EP);
B29C66/91231 (EP);
B29C66/91421 (EP);
B29C66/91431 (EP);
B29L2031/7129 (EP);
B31B2120/408 (EP);
B31B2155/001 (EP,US);
B31B2155/0012 (EP);
B31B2160/20 (EP);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (EP);
B29C66/8122, B29K2827/18 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/17] | B31B50/64, B31B50/72, B31B50/10, B65D33/02, B31B50/26, B31B105/00, B31B120/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PACKUNGEN | [2021/17] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR FORMING PACKAGES | [2021/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE FORMATION D'EMBALLAGES | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 31.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]GB837420 (EDOUARD ROGER ARMELIN, et al) [X] 16,19,22,27 * page 2, line 86 - page 3, line 108; figures 1,2 * [A] 1-15 [Y] 29 [I] 17,18,20,21,23-26,28,30; | [A]US3527633 (BERTOGLIO GUIDO D) [A] 1,16 * column 3, line 29 - line 60; figures 1,6 *; | [YA]US3855907 (JOHNSON K, et al) [Y] 29 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 54; figure 1a * [A] 1,16; | [A]WO2016176540 (GRAPHIC PACKAGING INT INC [US]) [A] 1-30* paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029]; figure 5 * | International search | [A]JP2006240670 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0011]-[0018] and figures 1-3, 7-8. *; | [A]US2011017812 (BELKO STEPHEN P [US], et al) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0070]-[0080] and figures 4-7. *; | [A]KR20120101632 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 1-30* See paragraphs [0019]-[0031] and figures 8a-14. *; | [A]US2015353218 (KÖHN UWE [DE], et al) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0029], [0045], [0066]-[0071] and figures 4a-6. *; | [A]WO2016176540 (GRAPHIC PACKAGING INT INC [US]) [A] 1-30 * See paragraphs [0024]-[0027], [0030]-[0031], [0036]-[0037] and figures 1-7, 14-16. * |