EP3794902 - UE SPECIFIC BEAMFORMING FOR NARROWBAND COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Chao 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
RICO ALVARINO, Alberto 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LIU, Le 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 19804306.9 | 15.05.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019CN86997 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN87267 | 17.05.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/087267 | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019219020 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3794902 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 21.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/02, H04L5/00, H04W8/24 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
H04W8/24 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04B7/0626 (US);
H04L5/001 (EP,US);
H04L5/0048 (EP,US);
H04W72/20 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | H04W88/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | BENUTZERGERÄTESPEZIFISCHE STRAHLFORMUNG FÜR SCHMALBANDKOMMUNIKATION | [2021/12] | English: | UE SPECIFIC BEAMFORMING FOR NARROWBAND COMMUNICATIONS | [2021/12] | French: | FORMATION DE FAISCEAU SPÉCIFIQUE À UN UE DESTINÉE À DES COMMUNICATIONS À BANDE ÉTROITE | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 13.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2016044517 (RAGHAVAN VASANTHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-10,14-18 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0086] * * page 11; figure 11 * [A] 3,4,11-13; | [YA]WO2017069474 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [Y] 1,2,5-10,14-18 * figure 12 * * paragraph [0194] - paragraph [0242] * [A] 3,4,11-13; | US10505778 [ ] (KIM EUNSUN [KR], et al) [ ] * figure 12 * * column 30, line 4 - line 52 * * column 31, line 65 - column 39, line 17 *; | [A] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Light RRC Connection Feature specification in 36.331", vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20180318), 3GPP DRAFT; 36331_CR2648R3_(REL-14)_R2-1702421, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg%5Fran/TSG%5FRAN/TSGR%5F75/Docs/RP%2D170627%2Ezip, (20180318), XP051507772 [A] 1-18 * UE-EUTRA Capability Field description; page 61 * | International search | [A]WO2017020699 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]CN106817209 (ALCATEL-LUCENT SHANGHAI BELL CO LTD) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]CN107241129 (BEIJING XINWEI TELECOM TECH INC) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2018045092 (INTEL IP CORP [US]) [A] 1-30* the whole document *; | [A] - HUAWEI et al., "TS 36.300 Section 5 for NB-IoT up to RAN1#84", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #84 Rl-161554, (20160219), vol. RAN WG1, XP051079463 [A] 1-30 * , sections 5.2-5.5 * | by applicant | US2016044517 | WO2017069474 |