EP3795058 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, ENDOSCOPE SYSTEM, AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2023 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2022/24] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states FUJIFILM CORPORATION 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMON, Shumpei c/o FUJIFILM Corporation, 798, Miyanodai, Kaisei- machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa 258-8538 / JP | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Jeffrey, Philip Michael, et al Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | [2022/24] |
Former [2021/12] | Jeffrey, Philip Michael Dehns Germany Theresienstraße 6-8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19804361.4 | 19.04.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019JP16744 | Priority number, date | JP20180093212 | 14.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018093212 | [2021/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019220859 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3795058 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3795058 | Date: | 15.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/045, A61B1/06, A61B1/07, H04N5/232, H04N7/18, H04N7/04, H04N9/04, H04N5/235, G06K9/62, G06V10/25, G06V10/75, G06V10/143, // H04N5/225 | [2022/13] | CPC: |
H04N7/183 (EP,US);
A61B1/00006 (EP,US);
A61B1/000094 (EP,US);
A61B1/0005 (EP,US);
A61B1/005 (US);
A61B1/044 (EP,US);
A61B1/045 (EP,US);
A61B1/063 (US);
A61B1/0638 (EP,US);
A61B1/0646 (US);
G06F18/24 (US);
G06V10/143 (EP,US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G06V10/751 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
H04N23/11 (EP);
H04N23/555 (EP,US);
H04N23/56 (EP,US);
H04N23/61 (EP);
H04N23/63 (EP);
H04N23/667 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/27] | A61B1/00, A61B1/045, A61B1/06, A61B1/07, H04N5/232, H04N7/18, H04N7/04, H04N9/04, H04N5/235, // H04N5/225 | ||
Former IPC [2021/12] | A61B1/00, A61B1/045, A61B1/06, A61B1/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ENDOSKOPSYSTEM UND BILDVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN | [2021/12] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, ENDOSCOPE SYSTEM, AND IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD | [2021/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE, SYSTÈME ENDOSCOPE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2020 | Translation filed | 12.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 24.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.06.2022 | AT | 15.06.2022 | CZ | 15.06.2022 | DK | 15.06.2022 | EE | 15.06.2022 | ES | 15.06.2022 | FI | 15.06.2022 | HR | 15.06.2022 | IT | 15.06.2022 | LT | 15.06.2022 | LV | 15.06.2022 | MC | 15.06.2022 | NL | 15.06.2022 | PL | 15.06.2022 | RO | 15.06.2022 | RS | 15.06.2022 | SE | 15.06.2022 | SI | 15.06.2022 | SK | 15.06.2022 | SM | 15.06.2022 | BG | 15.09.2022 | NO | 15.09.2022 | GR | 16.09.2022 | IS | 15.10.2022 | PT | 17.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
MC | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SI | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
DK | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 15.06.2022 | |
AT | 15.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
IS | 15.10.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
PL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
CZ | 15.06.2022 | ||
EE | 15.06.2022 | ||
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RO | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
SK | 15.06.2022 | ||
SM | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
PT | 17.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
ES | 15.06.2022 | ||
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 15.06.2022 | |
FI | 15.06.2022 | ||
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/02] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
NL | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
RS | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
HR | 15.06.2022 | ||
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
LV | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
BG | 15.09.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | ||
GR | 16.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 15.06.2022 | |
LT | 15.06.2022 | ||
SE | 15.06.2022 | ||
NO | 15.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012157775 (YAMAGUCHI HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0018] - [0026] - [0 52] - [0054] * | International search | [A]JP2011160848 (OLYMPUS CORP) [A] 1-18 * , paragraph [0128] *; | [A]JP2012157559 (FUJIFILM CORP) [A] 1-18 * , paragraph [0046] *; | [A]JP2017064091 (SONY CORP) [A] 1-18 * , paragraph [0052] *; | [A]US2017112356 (MITSUI MASANORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-18* , paragraphs [0106]-[0114], fig. 14-16 * | by applicant | JP2012213550 | JP2016062488 |