EP3793750 - ORGANOSILANE COATING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Henkel AG & Co. KGaA Henkelstrasse 67 40589 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/02] |
Former [2021/12] | For all designated states NBD Nanotechnologies, Inc. 419 Western Ave. Brighton, MA 02135 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Bong, June 41 Gerry Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | 02 /
ALTINOK, Esra 17 Venner Road Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 03 /
CATCHINGS, Perry, L., Sr. 46 Moreland Street Roxbury, MA 02119 / US | [2021/27] |
Former [2021/12] | 01 /
ZHANG, Bong, June 41 Gerry Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | ||
02 /
ALTINOK, Esra 520 High Street Medford, MA 02155 / US | |||
03 /
CATCHINGS, Perry, L., Sr. 46 Moreland Street Roxbury, MA 02119 / US | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6, D06 F9C7 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/12] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19804403.4 | 14.05.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019US32228 | Priority number, date | US201862671138P | 14.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862671138 P | [2021/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019222223 | Date: | 21.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3793750 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B05D1/02, C09D183/08, E04F13/08 | [2021/12] | CPC: |
C08G77/388 (EP);
C08J7/042 (US);
B05D5/08 (EP);
C08F220/20 (US);
C08F222/102 (US);
C08G77/18 (US);
C08G77/20 (US);
C08G77/26 (US);
C09D183/08 (EP);
B05D1/02 (EP);
B05D2518/12 (EP);
B05D2601/28 (EP);
B05D2701/30 (EP);
B05D3/0254 (EP);
B05D3/067 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Title | German: | ORGANOSILANBESCHICHTUNGSZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2021/12] | English: | ORGANOSILANE COATING COMPOSITIONS | [2021/12] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE REVÊTEMENT ORGANOSILANE | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 19.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2023 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2003194553 (MOIREAU PATRICK [FR]) [X] 1,2,5,11-13 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 17-21 * * example 11 * [A] 3,4,6-10; | [XA]US2008125539 (MACK HELMUT [DE]) [X] 13 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 12-19 * * examples 1,2, and 5 *[A] 1-12; | [XA]US2014363667 (YASUI ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,11-13 * page 1, paragraphs 2, 14 * * page 13, paragraphs 144-146 * * example 1 * [A] 5-10 | International search | [A]US5756209 (HALE ARTURO [US]) [A] 1-4, 24-26, 46-48 * Entire document *; | [A]US8318885 (MATSUKAWA KIMIHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4, 24-26, 46-48 * Entire document *; | [A]US9316906 (SHIN SEUNG RIM [KR], et al) [A] 1-4, 24-26, 46-48* Entire document *; | [X]US9428605 (WANG ZHIKAI [US], et al) [X] 1-4, 24-26, 46-48 * Entire document, especially Abstract,col 14 In 55-56; col 15 In 8-10, 16-24, 31-41; Table 2; Table 3 *; | [A] - TIAN et al., "Attapulgite Modified with Silane Coupling Agent for Phosphorus Adsorption and Deep Bleaching of Refined Palm Oil", Adsorption Science & Technology, (20140000), vol. 32, no. 1, pages 37 - 48, XP055654938 [A] 1, 24, 46 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1260/0263-6174.32.1.37 | [A] - HOYLE et al., "Photopolymerization of 1,6-Hexanediol Diacrylate: The Effect of Functionalized Amines", Polymer, (19880000), vol. 29, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0032-3861(88)90194-2, pages 18 - 23, XP024120256 [A] 1, 24, 46 * . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0032-3861(88)90194-2 | [A] - PAINT AND COATINGS INDUSTRY (PCI), "Crosslinking Technology for Fast-Curing, High-Performance, Low-VOC Coatings", PCI Magazine, PAINT AND COATINGS INDUSTRY, (20011001), URL: www.pcimag.com/articles/86518-crosslinking-technology-for-fast-curing-high-performance-low-voc-coatings, XP055654943 [A] 2, 47 * . * |