EP3880662 - NOVEL PATHWAY FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF DIAZIRINES, THAT MAY OR MAY NOT BE ENRICHED IN NITROGEN-15 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2023 [2023/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universite de Rouen Normandie 1 rue Thomas Becket 76130 Mont-Saint-Aignan / FR | For all designated states Université de Caen Normandie Esplanade de la Paix 14000 Caen / FR | For all designated states Institut National des Sciences Appliquées de Rouen (INSA) 685 Avenue de l'Université 76800 Saint-Etienne du Rouvray / FR | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Ecole Nationale Supérieure d'Ingénieurs de Caen 6, Boulevard du Maréchal Juin 14000 Caen / FR | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REBOUL, Vincent 1 Rue du Régiment de la Chaudière 14440 Douvres la Deliverande / FR | 02 /
FRANCK, Xavier 35 allée mercure 76230 Bois Gillaume / FR | 03 /
GLACHET, Thomas 73 avenue Georges Clémenceau 14000 Caen / FR | 04 /
MARZAG, Hamid 87 B rue de Coulmiers 45000 Orleans / FR | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2021/38] | Application number, filing date | 19804716.9 | 14.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019EP81393 | Priority number, date | FR20180060507 | 14.11.2018 Original published format: FR 1860507 | [2021/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020099596 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880662 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D229/02 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
C07D229/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Extension states | BA | 14.06.2021 | ME | 14.06.2021 | Validation states | MD | 14.06.2021 | Title | German: | NEUARTIGER WEG ZUR SYNTHESE VON DIAZIRINEN, DIE MIT WASSERSTOFF-15 ANGEREICHERT SEIN KÖNNEN ODER NICHT | [2021/38] | English: | NOVEL PATHWAY FOR THE SYNTHESIS OF DIAZIRINES, THAT MAY OR MAY NOT BE ENRICHED IN NITROGEN-15 | [2021/38] | French: | NOUVELLE VOIE DE SYNTHESE DE DIAZIRINES, ENRICHIES OU NON EN AZOTE-15 | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 14.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/45] | 23.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2022 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A] - Mingyou Hu ET AL, "S-1 Supporting Information gem-Difluoroolefination of Diazo Compounds with TMSCF 3 or TMSCF 2 Br: Transition-Metal-Free Cross-Coupling of Two Carbene Precursors 3.1 Full Screening of Condition for Reaction of 1a with TMSCF 3 (Table S1)", (20151026), URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/suppl/10.1021/jacs.5b09888/suppl_file/ja5b09888_si_001.pdf, (20190717), XP055606590 [A] 1-9 * pages S-6 * | [A] - Kun Shen ET AL, "Supporting Information Diazirines as Potential Molecular Imaging Tags: Probing the Requirements for Efficient and Long-Lived SABRE-Induced Hyperpolarization", (20170629), URL: https://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/action/downloadSupplement?doi=10.1002/anie.201704970&file=anie201704970-sup-0001-misc_information.pdf, (20190716), XP055606162 [A] 1-9 * compounds 2-5 * | [A] - Guojiao Wu ET AL, "Supporting Information for Metal-Free Oxidative Cross-Coupling of Diazirines with Arylboronic Acids CONTENTS", (20151202), URL: http://www.rsc.org/suppdata/c5/cc/c5cc08855k/c5cc08855k1.pdf, (20190718), XP055606961 [A] 1-9 * page S2 - page S3 * | [A] - ERNI B ET AL, "FATTY ACIDS CONTAINING PHOTOACTIVABLE CARBENE PRECURSORS. SYNTHESISAND PHOTOCHEMICAL PROPERTIES OF 3,3-BIS(1,1-DIFLUOROHEXYL)DIAZIRINEAND 3-(1,1-DIFLUOROOCTYL)-3H-DIAZIRINE", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19800521), vol. 102, no. 11, doi:10.1021/JA00531A034, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 3888 - 3896, XP001013157 [A] 1-9 * scheme III and V; page 3890 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00531a034 | [A] - MOHAMMAD AL-OMARI ET AL, "Bi-3H-diazirin-3-yls as Precursors of Highly Strained Cycloalkynes", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE, INTERNATIONAL EDITION, DE, (2006), vol. 45, no. 2, doi:10.1002/anie.200503124, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 309 - 311, XP055606972 [A] 1-9 * scheme 3, 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200503124 | by applicant | WO2016049123 | WO2016096897 | WO2010076490 | WO2017045891 | WO2014081391 | - HILL, J. R.ROBERTSON, A. A. B., J. Med. Chem., (20180000), vol. 61, pages 6945 - 6963 | - THEIS, T.ORTIZ JR., G. X.LOGAN, A. W. J.CLAYTON, K. E.FENG, Y.HUHN, W. P.BLUM, V.MALCOLMSON, S. J.CHEKMENEV, E. Y.WANG, Q., Science Advances, (20160000), vol. 2, page e1501438 | - SHEN, K.LOGAN, A. W. J.COLELL, J. F. P.BAE, J.ORTIZ JR., G. X.THEIS, T.WARREN, W. S.MALCOLMSON, S. J.WANG, Q., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed., (20170000), vol. 56, page 12112 | - ZAKARIAN, A. et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (20180000), vol. 140, pages 6027 - 6032 | - HARRISON et al., Compendium of Synthetic Organic Methods, J. Wiley & sons, (19710000), vol. 1 à 8 |