EP3843829 - LEADS FOR STIMULATION AND SENSING IN A STIMULATOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 25.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Neuromodulation Corporation 25155 Rye Canyon Loop Valencia, CA 91355 / US | [2021/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ESTELLER, Rosana 28375 Citrus Place Santa Clarita, CA 91390 / US | 02 /
CARBUNARU, Rafael 11916 Otsego Street Valley Village, CA 91067 / US | 03 /
FEATHERSTONE, Adam 2226 W Maracay Dr. Meridian, ID 83646 / US | [2021/27] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/27] | Application number, filing date | 19804930.6 | 23.10.2019 | [2021/27] | WO2019US57631 | Priority number, date | US201862768617P | 16.11.2018 Original published format: US 201862768617 P | [2021/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020101853 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3843829 | Date: | 07.07.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3843829 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/05, A61N1/36 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
A61N1/0551 (EP,US);
A61N1/0553 (EP,US);
A61N1/36135 (EP,US);
A61B5/388 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELECTRODENLEITUNGEN ZUR STIMULATION UND MESSUNG IN EINER STIMULATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2023/52] | English: | LEADS FOR STIMULATION AND SENSING IN A STIMULATOR DEVICE | [2021/27] | French: | CONDUCTEURS DE STIMULATION ET DE DÉTECTION DANS UN DISPOSITIF STIMULATEUR | [2021/27] |
Former [2021/27] | ANSCHLUSSDRÄHTE ZUR STIMULATION UND MESSUNG IN EINER STIMULATORVORRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/27] | 30.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]US5913882 (KING GARY WILLIAM [US]) [X] 1-12,14,15 * column 2, lines 24-60; figures 1-5 * * column 5, lines 25-28 * [A] 16-31 [Y] 13; | [XA]US2002022873 (ERICKSON JOHN H [US], et al) [X] 1,16-25,27-31 * paragraphs [0003] , [0007] , [0008] , [0018] , [0047] , [0052] , [0058]; figures 5,7C * [A] 26; | [YA]US2016121124 (JOHANEK LISA M [US], et al) [Y] 13 * paragraphs [0042] , [0045] , [0096]; figures 1,6b * [A] 1-12,14-31; | [X]US2016206873 (HOU WENBO [US], et al) [X] 1,16 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0026] , [0027] , [0035] , [0037]; figures 4,5 *; | [X]US2016303368 (PARRAMON JORDI [US], et al) [X] 1,16* paragraphs [0008] , [0028] , [0042] , [0045] - [0047] - [0061] - [0063]; figures 1,6,9 * | by applicant | US6181969 | US6516227 | US2012095529 | US8768453 | US2015080982 | US9061140 | US2015360038 | US2017296823 | US2018071520 | US2019076645 | US2019099602 |