05.04.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] |
03.04.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
03.04.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.04.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
06.12.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.11.2023 |
Change - German title |
published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] |
20.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.07.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
18.03.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.03.2023 |
First examination report |
|
21.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2022 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
21.01.2022 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.02.2022 [2022/08] |
22.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.10.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
12.06.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
04.06.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
04.06.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] |
28.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
30.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
25.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|