|
14.06.2024 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2023 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2023 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2023 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.07.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2023 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2023 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.02.2023 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.02.2023 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
27.02.2023 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
02.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
23.12.2022 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
07.12.2022 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2021 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2021 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2021 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.11.2020 |
Information regarding early processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.06.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
14.05.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.05.2020 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
18.01.2020 |
Substitute sheet (Rule 26) - drawings for ISA/EP |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
8 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
13.11.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |