Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11398794 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2022 | B2 | US2021234497 | 29.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862755742 | 05.11.2018 | US201915734638 | 29.10.2019 | WO2019US58497 | 29.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112313873B | Global Dossier | 22.03.2024 | B | CN112313873 | 02.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862755742 | 05.11.2018 | WO2019US58497 | 29.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3878091 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2023 | B1 | EP3878091 | 15.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862755742 | 05.11.2018 | WO2019US58497 | 29.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2953149T | 08.11.2023 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US201862755742 | 05.11.2018 | WO2019US58497 | 29.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020096809 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862755742 | 05.11.2018 |