EP3887195 - SYSTEM HAVING AN ELECTRIC CONSUMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/40] | SYSTEM HAVING AN ELECTRIC CONSUMER | ||
[2022/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEW-EURODRIVE GmbH & Co. KG Ernst-Blickle-Str. 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2021/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENKEL, Rico Fliederweg 3 68794 Oberhausen-Rheinhausen / DE | 02 /
BUND, Martin Wehlauer Strasse 18 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | 03 /
EPP, Mario Hindemithweg 18 69245 Bammental / DE | 04 /
HIEN, Stefan Hans-Purrmann-Allee 6 67346 Speyer / DE | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Tüngler, Eberhard Sew-Eurodrive GmbH & Co. KG Abteilung ISI Ernst-Blickle-Straße 42 76646 Bruchsal / DE | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19805134.4 | 24.10.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019EP25363 | Priority number, date | DE20181009349 | 29.11.2018 Original published format: DE102018009349 | [2021/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020108795 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887195 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3887195 | Date: | 04.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60M3/04, B60M7/00, B60L5/36 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
B60M3/04 (EP,US);
B60L5/36 (EP,US);
B60M7/00 (EP);
H02H7/08 (US);
H02P27/06 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/40] | B60L5/36, B60M3/04, B60M7/00, H02H3/00, H02H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE MIT ELEKTRISCHEM VERBRAUCHER | [2022/31] | English: | SYSTEM HAVING AN ELECTRIC CONSUMER | [2022/31] | French: | INSTALLATION ÉQUIPÉE D'UN CONSOMMATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/40] | ANLAGE MIT ELEKTRISCHEM VERBRAUCHER | ||
Former [2021/40] | SYSTEM HAVING AN ELECTRIC CONSUMER | ||
Former [2021/40] | INSTALLATION ÉQUIPÉE D'UN CONSOMMATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 29.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.11.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 05.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 04.01.2023 | DK | 04.01.2023 | EE | 04.01.2023 | FI | 04.01.2023 | HR | 04.01.2023 | LT | 04.01.2023 | LV | 04.01.2023 | MC | 04.01.2023 | NL | 04.01.2023 | RO | 04.01.2023 | RS | 04.01.2023 | SE | 04.01.2023 | SI | 04.01.2023 | SK | 04.01.2023 | SM | 04.01.2023 | NO | 04.04.2023 | GR | 05.04.2023 | IS | 04.05.2023 | PT | 04.05.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/11] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SI | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SK | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | CZ | 04.01.2023 | |
DK | 04.01.2023 | ||
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RO | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | DK | 04.01.2023 | |
EE | 04.01.2023 | ||
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | DK | 04.01.2023 | |
FI | 04.01.2023 | ||
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
SM | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | FI | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
IS | 04.05.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | FI | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
GR | 05.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 04.01.2023 | |
HR | 04.01.2023 | ||
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
LV | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
SE | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 04.01.2023 | |
LT | 04.01.2023 | ||
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
NO | 04.04.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | LT | 04.01.2023 | |
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
RS | 04.01.2023 | ||
PT | 04.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | LT | 04.01.2023 | |
NL | 04.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 04.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2773001 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]DE102014013500 (EISENMANN AG [DE]); | [A]DE102017008381 (SEW EURODRIVE GMBH & CO [DE]); | [A]WO2018086820 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | by applicant | DE102014013500 |