EP3874071 - PROCESSES FOR EXTRACTING METALS FROM LITHIUM-ION BATTERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALBEMARLE CORPORATION 4250 Congress Street Suite 900 Charlotte NC 28209-4615 / US | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DING, Nan 438 Mammoth Oaks Lane Charlotte, NC 28270 / US | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19805454.6 | 25.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019US58074 | Priority number, date | US201862752689P | 30.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862752689 P | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020092157 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874071 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C22B3/04, C22B3/44, C22B7/00, C22B3/00, C22B26/12 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
C22B7/006 (EP,KR);
H01M10/54 (KR);
C22B26/12 (EP,KR,US);
C22B23/0407 (EP,KR);
C22B23/043 (US);
C22B3/04 (EP,KR);
C22B3/08 (US);
C22B3/44 (EP,KR,US);
C22B7/007 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR EXTRAKTION VON METALLEN AUS LITHIUM-IONEN-BATTERIEN | [2021/36] | English: | PROCESSES FOR EXTRACTING METALS FROM LITHIUM-ION BATTERIES | [2021/36] | French: | PROCÉDÉS D'EXTRACTION DE MÉTAUX À PARTIR DE BATTERIES LITHIUM-ION | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 21.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN103956534 (HUNAN ZHONGJUN TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 5-13* the whole document *; | [XY]WO2014154152 (SICHUAN TIANQI LITHIUM IND INC [CN]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * the whole document * [Y] 5,10-13; | [XYI]CN107117661 (JINCHUAN GROUP CO LTD) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 5-13 [I] 2-4 |