EP3894156 - METHOD FOR DECORATING IN THICKNESS A CERAMIC SLAB [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states System Ceramics S.p.A. Via Ghiarola Vecchia 73 41042 Fiorano Modenese MO / IT | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEFANI, Franco Viale Giacobazzi 25 41049 Sassuolo (Modena) / IT | 02 /
GOZZI, Franco Via Don Luigi Sturzo 33 41043 Formigine (Modena) / IT | 03 /
VACCARI, Paolo Via Vignolese 877/2 41125 Modena / IT | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Casadei, Giovanni Bugnion S.p.A. Via Vellani Marchi, 20 41124 Modena / IT | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19805866.1 | 28.11.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019IB60275 | Priority number, date | IT20180010922 | 10.12.2018 Original published format: IT201800010922 | [2021/42] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020121101 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3894156 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3894156 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B28B1/00, B28B3/12, B28B5/02, B28B13/02, B30B15/30, B44F9/04, B28B17/00 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
B28B3/123 (EP);
B28B5/027 (EP,US);
B28B1/005 (EP);
B28B13/0215 (EP);
B28B13/022 (EP,US);
B28B13/028 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM DEKORIEREN DER DICKE EINER KERAMISCHEN PLATTE | [2021/42] | English: | METHOD FOR DECORATING IN THICKNESS A CERAMIC SLAB | [2021/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉCORATION DANS L'ÉPAISSEUR D'UNE DALLE EN CÉRAMIQUE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 01.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 01.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5736084 (UCHIDA HIROSHI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1977872 (T S C S P A [IT]); | [XY]CN201436168U (KEDA IND CO LTD); | [XYI]CN102303357 (FOSHAN HEZHIZHOU ELECTROMECHANICAL CO LTD); | [X]CN103481358B (GUANGDONG JIAJUN CERAMICS CO LTD); | [X]CN104708707 (HUIYA CERAMICS CO LTD) |