EP3891192 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN AQUEOUS POLYMER DISPERSION FROM VINYLAROMATIC COMPOUND AND CONJUGATED ALIPHATIC DIENE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWRENZ, Dirk Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
VELING, Nico Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
CIMPEANU, Carmen-Elena Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE GBI-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2021/41] | Application number, filing date | 19805975.0 | 21.11.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019EP82145 | Priority number, date | EP20180209822 | 03.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18209822 | [2021/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020114797 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3891192 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F2/22, C08F12/08, C08L25/10, C08L53/02, C09D109/08, C09J109/08 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
C08F2/22 (EP,US);
C08F212/08 (EP,US);
C08F236/06 (US);
C08K3/013 (US);
C08K5/14 (US);
C09D109/06 (US);
C09D125/10 (EP);
D21H19/36 (EP);
D21H19/48 (EP);
D21H19/54 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F212/08, C08F2/22 (EP);
C08F212/08, C08F236/06, C08F220/06, C08F222/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER WÄSSRIGEN POLYMERDISPERSION AUS VINYLAROMATISCHER VERBINDUNG UND KONJUGIERTEM ALIPHATISCHEN DIEN | [2021/41] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN AQUEOUS POLYMER DISPERSION FROM VINYLAROMATIC COMPOUND AND CONJUGATED ALIPHATIC DIENE | [2021/41] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION D'UNE DISPERSION POLYMÈRE AQUEUSE À PARTIR D'UN COMPOSÉ VINYLAROMATIQUE ET D'UN DIÈNE ALIPHATIQUE CONJUGUÉ | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 05.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]WO2009047233 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 9-14 * page 10, line 28 - line 39; examples 1-7; claims 1, 18-20 * [A] 1-8[I] 9-14; | [XAI]WO2010094641 (BASF SE [DE], et al) [X] 9-14 * page 11, line 27 - line 36; example 3; claims 2, 16-18 * [A] 1-8 [I] 9-14 | by applicant | US4269749 | DE4419518 | DE4435423 | DE4435422 | WO9909251 | EP1408059 | EP2370484 | EP2580257 | - HOUBEN-WEYL, Methoden der organischen Chemie, Band XIV/1, Makromolekulare Stoffe, Georg-Thieme-Verlag, (19610000), pages 411 - 420 | - D. URBANK. TAKAMURA, Polymer Dispersions and Their Industriai Applications, Wiley-VCH Verlag GmbH, (20020000), page 90 ff |