EP3902719 - ADAPTER FOR MOTOR VEHICLE WINDSCREEN WIPER BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage ZA L'Agiot 8 Rue Louis Lormand CS 90581 La Verrière 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | For all designated states Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage ZA L'Agiot 8 Rue Louis Lormand CS 90581 La Verriere 78322 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JARASSON, Jean-Michel Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage 8, rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verriere 78322 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR | 02 /
CAILLOT, Gérald Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage ZA L' Agiot 8 Rue Louis Lormand CS 90581 LA VERRIERE 78322 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR | 03 /
IZABEL, Vincent Valeo Systèmes d'Essuyage 8, rue Louis Lormand CS 80517 La Verriere 78322 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/44] | 01 /
JARASSON, Jean-Michel 78322 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR | ||
02 /
CAILLOT, Gérald 78322 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR | |||
03 /
IZABEL, Vincent 78322 LE MESNIL SAINT DENIS / FR | Representative(s) | Valeo Visibility Service Propriété Industrielle c/o Valeo Vision 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny / FR | [2021/44] | Application number, filing date | 19805998.2 | 26.11.2019 | [2021/44] | WO2019EP82516 | Priority number, date | FR20180074353 | 28.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1874353 | [2021/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020135961 | Date: | 02.07.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3902719 | Date: | 03.11.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/40, B60S1/38 | [2021/44] | CPC: |
B60S1/4048 (EP);
B60S1/3868 (EP);
B60S1/4041 (EP);
B60S1/3862 (EP);
B60S2001/4054 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/44] | Title | German: | ADAPTER FÜR SCHEIBENWISCHERBLATT EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS | [2021/44] | English: | ADAPTER FOR MOTOR VEHICLE WINDSCREEN WIPER BLADE | [2021/44] | French: | ADAPTATEUR POUR BALAI D'ESSUIE-GLACE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2021/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/44] | 14.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/39] | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006272119 (GENET SOPHIE [FR]) [X] 1,3-7,11 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030] * * figures 2-7 *; | [X]EP1795406 (FEDERAL MOGUL SA [BE]) [X] 1,8,11-13 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] ** figures 2,3 *; | [Y]WO2007122095 (FEDERAL MOGUL SA [BE], et al) [Y] 9 * page 8, line 21 - page 9, line 28 * * figures 2,3 *; | [XAI]WO2013185861 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-7,11-13 * page 7, paragraph 6 - page 8, paragraph 5 * * figures 1,2,4-11 * [A] 10,14,15 [I] 2; | [XY]US2018105144 (YEE JESUS [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8,11-13 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * figures 1-7 * [Y] 9 | by applicant | DE102008011449 |