EP3884473 - SIGNALLING DURESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | 19.09.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASSA ABLOY AB P.O. Box 70340 107 23 Stockholm / SE | [2021/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SINGH, Sona Rinds Gränd 5 187 37 Täby / SE | 02 /
GRAPE, Felix Stenkilsvägen 4 181 41 Lidingö / SE | [2024/43] |
Former [2021/39] | 01 /
SINGH, Sona Rinds Gränd 5 187 37 Täby / SE | ||
02 /
GRAPE, Felix Stenkilsvägen 4 181 65 Lidingö / SE | Representative(s) | Kransell & Wennborg KB P.O. Box 27834 115 93 Stockholm / SE | [2021/39] | Application number, filing date | 19806196.2 | 19.11.2019 | [2021/39] | WO2019EP81763 | Priority number, date | SE20180051439 | 20.11.2018 Original published format: SE 1851439 | [2021/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020104439 | Date: | 28.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3884473 | Date: | 29.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3884473 | Date: | 23.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G07C9/00, // G08B25/01, G08B25/08 | [2024/03] | CPC: |
G07C9/00309 (EP,CN,US);
H04W76/10 (CN);
G08B25/016 (EP,US);
G08B21/0277 (CN);
G08B25/10 (US);
H04W4/20 (CN);
G07C2009/00507 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/39] | G07C9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NÖTIGUNGSSIGNALISIERUNG | [2021/39] | English: | SIGNALLING DURESS | [2021/39] | French: | SIGNALISATION DE CONTRAINTE | [2021/39] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/39] | 20.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1971172 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]); | [XI]EP2262292 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]); | [XI]US2013091561 (BRUSO KEISEY L [US], et al) |