EP3782880 - VEHICLE BODY STRUCTURE FOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV, NL | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2023/48] |
Former [2021/08] | For all designated states MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MURAOKA, Shuji c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION, 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu- cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
MORIMOTO, Makoto c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION, 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu- cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
KIGUCHI, Haruki c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION, 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu- cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
NAKAMURA, Satoshi c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION, 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu- cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2023/41] |
Former [2021/08] | 01 /
MURAOKA Shuji c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION, 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu- cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | ||
02 /
MORIMOTO Makoto c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION, 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu- cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | |||
03 /
KIGUCHI Haruki c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION, 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu- cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | |||
04 /
NAKAMURA Satoshi c/o MAZDA MOTOR CORPORATION, 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu- cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2021/08] | Application number, filing date | 19806551.8 | 22.05.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019JP20256 | Priority number, date | JP20180098722 | 23.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018098722 | [2021/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019225642 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3782880 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3782880 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B62D25/20, B60J5/00, B62D21/15, B62D25/02, B62D25/04, B62D27/02 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
B62D25/025 (EP,US);
B60J5/00 (EP);
B62D21/15 (EP);
B62D21/157 (US);
B62D25/04 (EP,US);
B62D27/023 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | B62D25/20, B60J5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGKAROSSERIESTRUKTUR FÜR FAHRZEUG | [2021/08] | English: | VEHICLE BODY STRUCTURE FOR VEHICLE | [2021/08] | French: | STRUCTURE DE CARROSSERIE DE VÉHICULE POUR VÉHICULE | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2020 | Translation filed | 18.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 16.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.11.2023 | HR | 29.11.2023 | LT | 29.11.2023 | LV | 29.11.2023 | NL | 29.11.2023 | PL | 29.11.2023 | RS | 29.11.2023 | SE | 29.11.2023 | BG | 29.02.2024 | NO | 29.02.2024 | GR | 01.03.2024 | IS | 29.03.2024 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | ES | 29.11.2023 | |
HR | 29.11.2023 | ||
LT | 29.11.2023 | ||
PL | 29.11.2023 | ||
RS | 29.11.2023 | ||
SE | 29.11.2023 | ||
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
NO | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 29.11.2023 | |
BG | 29.02.2024 | ||
GR | 01.03.2024 | ||
IS | 29.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 01.03.2024 | |
IS | 29.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013264840 (IZUMI YOSHITAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2017050675 (KELLNER PHILIPP [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]US2017203792 (SUNOHARA KENJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8* paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0091]; figure 1 * | International search | [A]JPS6024672U (MAZDA MOTOR CORP.) [A] 1-8 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000203462 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-8 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2010137597 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-8 * (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2014083972 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-8 * (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2014155539 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP])[A] 1-8; | [A]JP2016094115 (SUZUKI MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-8 * (Family: none) * | by applicant | JP2010269613 |