EP3805507 - INSTALLATION STRUCTURE OF GLASS FIXING GASKET AND WINDOW GLASS PANEL FIXING BRACKET OF FIXED WINDOW IN SLIDING WINDOW SYSTEM COMPRISING SEGMENTED WINDOW FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Filobe Co., Ltd. 31-16, Gongdan 7-ro, Jillyang-eup Gyeongsan-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do 38465 / KR | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kwang-Seog 103-1902, 173, Bokhyeon-ro Buk-gu Daegu 41523 / KR | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
LEE, Kwang-Seog 103-1902, 173, Bokhyeon-ro, Buk-gu Daegu 41523 / KR | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Matthias W. Patentanwalt Schwanseestrasse 43 81549 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19806572.4 | 24.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019KR06290 | Priority number, date | KR20180058870 | 24.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180058870 | [2021/15] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019226023 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805507 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3805507 | Date: | 25.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/26, E06B3/267, E06B3/46, E06B3/54, E06B3/58, E05D15/06, E06B7/16, E06B3/263 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
E06B3/26347 (EP,US);
E06B3/2605 (KR,US);
E06B3/4618 (EP,KR,US);
E06B3/26303 (EP);
E06B3/26307 (EP);
E06B3/2675 (KR);
E06B3/5835 (EP);
E06B3/5842 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (US);
E06B2003/2625 (KR,US);
E06B2003/26321 (EP);
E06B2003/6223 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | E06B3/26, E06B3/267, E06B3/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INSTALLATIONSSTRUKTUR FÜR EINE GLASBEFESTIGUNGSDICHTUNG UND FENSTERGLASSCHEIBENBEFESTIGUNGSKLAMMER EINES STARREN FENSTERS IN EINEM SCHIEBEFENSTERSYSTEM MIT SEGMENTIERTEM FENSTERRAHMEN | [2021/15] | English: | INSTALLATION STRUCTURE OF GLASS FIXING GASKET AND WINDOW GLASS PANEL FIXING BRACKET OF FIXED WINDOW IN SLIDING WINDOW SYSTEM COMPRISING SEGMENTED WINDOW FRAME | [2021/15] | French: | STRUCTURE D'INSTALLATION DE JOINT DE FIXATION DE VERRE ET SUPPORT DE FIXATION DE PANNEAU DE VERRE DE FENÊTRE DE FENÊTRE FIXE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE FENÊTRE COULISSANTE COMPRENANT UN CADRE DE FENÊTRE SEGMENTÉ | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2020 | Translation filed | 22.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 18.08.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.12.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 26.10.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.01.2023 | CZ | 25.01.2023 | DK | 25.01.2023 | EE | 25.01.2023 | ES | 25.01.2023 | FI | 25.01.2023 | HR | 25.01.2023 | IT | 25.01.2023 | LT | 25.01.2023 | LV | 25.01.2023 | MC | 25.01.2023 | NL | 25.01.2023 | PL | 25.01.2023 | RO | 25.01.2023 | RS | 25.01.2023 | SE | 25.01.2023 | SI | 25.01.2023 | SK | 25.01.2023 | SM | 25.01.2023 | NO | 25.04.2023 | GR | 26.04.2023 | GB | 24.05.2023 | IE | 24.05.2023 | LU | 24.05.2023 | IS | 25.05.2023 | PT | 25.05.2023 | BE | 31.05.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/25] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
GB | 24.05.2023 | ||
IE | 24.05.2023 | ||
LU | 24.05.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
BE | 31.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IE | 24.05.2023 | ||
LU | 24.05.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SI | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 24.05.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
MC | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 24.05.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SK | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/49] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
CZ | 25.01.2023 | ||
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RO | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
EE | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
DK | 25.01.2023 | ||
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
SM | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/39] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
IS | 25.05.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/38] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
PL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
GR | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
FI | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
LV | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
SE | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AT | 25.01.2023 | |
ES | 25.01.2023 | ||
HR | 25.01.2023 | ||
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
NO | 25.04.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
RS | 25.01.2023 | ||
PT | 25.05.2023 | ||
Former [2023/33] | ES | 25.01.2023 | |
LT | 25.01.2023 | ||
NL | 25.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/31] | NL | 25.01.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0726846 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD, et al); | [A]KR101540049B (KEANGNAM WINDOW & DOOR CO LTD [KR], et al); | [A]KR20160069005 (LG HAUSYS LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20170130162 (LG HAUSYS LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20180046781 (FILOBE CO LTD [KR]) |