EP3796846 - URINE-SAMPLING KIT AND METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. R. Bard, Inc. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | [2021/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WAITKUS, Tim 8 Crownview Ct. Sparta, NJ 07871 / US | 02 /
FODOUOP, Chris 180 Jackson St NE Apt. 6415 Atlanta, GA 30312 / US | 03 /
LEEKE, Kelsey 634 Amsterdam Ave. NE Atlanta, GA 30306 / US | 04 /
GOHDE, John 130 Third Avenue Decatur, GA 30030 / US | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19806743.1 | 21.05.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019US33382 | Priority number, date | US201862675112P | 22.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862675112 P | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019226693 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3796846 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B10/00, A61B42/10, A61B46/23, A61M25/00, A61M25/18, A61M27/00 | [2021/13] | CPC: |
A61B10/007 (EP,KR,US);
A61B42/10 (KR);
A61B42/40 (EP,US);
A61B46/20 (EP,KR,US);
A61B50/30 (EP,KR);
A61B50/33 (US);
A61M25/0017 (KR);
A61M25/002 (KR);
A61M39/02 (KR);
A61M39/18 (KR);
A61B10/00 (US);
A61B10/0045 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | URINPROBENAHMEKIT UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/13] | English: | URINE-SAMPLING KIT AND METHODS THEREOF | [2021/13] | French: | KIT D'ÉCHANTILLONNAGE D'URINE ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 09.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6520948 (MATHIAS JEAN-MARIE [BE], et al); | [Y]US2003195478 (RUSSO RONALD D [US]); | [Y]US2014188002 (CLOSE BENJAMIN W [US], et al); | [Y]US2016054202 (YONG PETER A K [US]); | [IY]US2017216558 (HUGHETT DAVID [US], et al) | International search | [A]US2007161971 (HOUSE JAMIE G [US]); | [A]US2012172822 (GILMAN THOMAS H [US]); | [A]US2015290425 (MACY JR BRADFORD [US], et al); | [A]US2017216558 (HUGHETT DAVID [US], et al); | [A]US2018057196 (TOMES JENNIFER E [US], et al) | by applicant | US6520948 | US2004195478 | US2014188002 | US2016054202 | US2017216558 |