28.05.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.05.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.12.2022 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.06.2022 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
10.06.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
10.06.2022 |
Change - classification |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
27.05.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.11.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.07.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
30.07.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] |
22.05.2021 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
21.05.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
21.05.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.06.2021 [2021/25] |
12.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.04.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
23.04.2021 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
30.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.03.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
29.03.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.02.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.01.2021 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2019 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|