Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190133637 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180058465 | 23.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20190133633 | Global Dossier | 03.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180058468 | 23.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102346724B | Global Dossier | 04.01.2022 | B1 | KR20190133636 | 03.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180058464 | 23.05.2018 | KR20180058466 | 23.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102283542B | Global Dossier | 29.07.2021 | B1 | KR20190133635 | 03.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180058468 | 23.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102273066B | Global Dossier | 05.07.2021 | B1 | KR20190133634 | 03.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180058467 | 23.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102254572B | Global Dossier | 21.05.2021 | B1 | KR20190133638 | 03.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20180058468 | 23.05.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3838282 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2022 | A4 | EP3838282 | 23.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019KR06222 | 23.05.2019 | KR20180058465 | 23.05.2018 | KR20180058468 | 23.05.2018 | KR20180058467 | 23.05.2018 | KR20180058466 | 23.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019225995 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20180058465 | 23.05.2018 | KR20180058468 | 23.05.2018 | KR20180058467 | 23.05.2018 | KR20180058466 | 23.05.2018 |