Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.05.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
10.06.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
03.06.2022 | Change - classification | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
03.06.2022 | Change - classification | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
27.05.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.02.2022 | Change - classification | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
11.02.2022 | Change - classification | published on 16.03.2022 [2022/11] |
24.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant | |
23.07.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
23.07.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] |
18.05.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.03.2021 | Change - inventor | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
26.02.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
26.02.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.03.2021 [2021/13] |
19.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
02.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.01.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
22.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
21.12.2020 | Change - representative | |
21.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.11.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.11.2019 | New entry: applicant or inventor |