EP3795195 - SYRINGE-TYPE EJECTION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nipro Corporation 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | [2021/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YABE, Yukihiro c/o NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | 02 /
ADACHI, Kazuto c/o NIPRO CORPORATION 9-3, Honjo-nishi 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 531-8510 / JP | [2021/12] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2021/12] | Application number, filing date | 19808229.9 | 16.04.2019 | [2021/12] | WO2019JP16336 | Priority number, date | JP20180099752 | 24.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018099752 | [2021/12] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019225226 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3795195 | Date: | 24.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3795195 | Date: | 05.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61M11/00, B05B1/06, B05B1/00, B65D83/00, A61M15/08, B05B1/34, B05B11/00, B05B11/02 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
A61M15/08 (EP);
A61M11/007 (EP,US);
B05B1/3436 (EP);
B05B11/025 (EP);
A61M15/0025 (EP);
A61M2202/0468 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/12] | A61M11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SPRITZENARTIGE AUSSTOSSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/12] | English: | SYRINGE-TYPE EJECTION DEVICE | [2021/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉJECTION DE TYPE SERINGUE | [2021/12] | Entry into regional phase | 16.12.2020 | Translation filed | 16.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 16.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 16.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/12] | 17.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.05.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.07.2023 | CZ | 05.07.2023 | DK | 05.07.2023 | EE | 05.07.2023 | ES | 05.07.2023 | FI | 05.07.2023 | HR | 05.07.2023 | IT | 05.07.2023 | LT | 05.07.2023 | LV | 05.07.2023 | NL | 05.07.2023 | PL | 05.07.2023 | RO | 05.07.2023 | RS | 05.07.2023 | SE | 05.07.2023 | SI | 05.07.2023 | SK | 05.07.2023 | SM | 05.07.2023 | NO | 05.10.2023 | GR | 06.10.2023 | IS | 05.11.2023 | PT | 06.11.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
IT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
EE | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SK | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
CZ | 05.07.2023 | ||
DK | 05.07.2023 | ||
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RO | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
SM | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
HR | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
LV | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
PL | 05.07.2023 | ||
RS | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
PT | 06.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 05.07.2023 | |
ES | 05.07.2023 | ||
FI | 05.07.2023 | ||
LT | 05.07.2023 | ||
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
SE | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
IS | 05.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 05.07.2023 | |
NL | 05.07.2023 | ||
NO | 05.10.2023 | ||
GR | 06.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/05] | NL | 05.07.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2015123297 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * figure 1 ** paragraphs [0012] - [0018] - [0026] - [0032] *; | [L]EP3603710 (NIPRO CORP [JP]) [L] 1-3 * figures 10, 11, 12, 14, 16, 27-36 * * paragraphs [0024] - [0060] - [0071] - [0082] - [0090] - [0104] * | International search | [Y]JPH11114065 (SHINKO CHEM) [Y] 1-3 * , *; | [A]US2012126035 (GREINER-PERTH JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-3* , & WO 2011/015292 A2, & KR 10-2012-0052956 A & CN 102612383 A *; | [A]JP2013031599 (NIPRO CORP) [A] 1-3 * , *; | [A]WO2013125555 (NOZZLE NETWORK CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * , *; | [Y]JP2014140616 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [Y] 1-3 * , [0022], [0035]-[0042], [0049], 1-3, 5-6 & US 2015/0329271 A1, [0033], [0046]-[0053], [0060], 1-3, 5-6 & WO 2014/103139 A1 & EP 2939700 A1 & CN 104870037 A *; | [Y]JP2014140588 (SHINKO CHEM) [Y] 3 * , 2 *; | [A]JP2017159096 (YOSHINO KOGYOSHO CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * , * | by applicant | JP2001137344 |