EP3880429 - DEGASSING EXTRUDER HAVING A MULTI-SCREW UNIT AND METHOD FOR DEGASSING POLYMER MELTS THEREWITH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gneuss GmbH Mönichhusen 42 32549 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | [2021/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GNEUSS, Stephan Schützenstraße 77 32547 Bad Oeynhausen / DE | 02 /
GNEUSS, Daniel 14376 Nolen Lane Charlotte, NC, 28277 / US | 03 /
GNEUSS, Detlef Via Promessi Sposi 20, Casa Nera 6919 Carabietta Tessin / CH | [2021/38] | Representative(s) | Tarvenkorn, Oliver Boehmert & Boehmert Jägerhofstraße 21 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/38] | Tarvenkorn, Oliver Tarvenkorn & Wickord Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Haus Sentmaring 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 19808557.3 | 18.11.2019 | [2021/38] | WO2019EP81697 | Priority number, date | DE201810128884 | 16.11.2018 Original published format: DE102018128884 | DE201910127884 | 15.10.2019 Original published format: DE102019127884 | [2021/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020099684 | Date: | 22.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3880429 | Date: | 22.09.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/435, B29C48/67, B29C48/76 | [2021/38] | CPC: |
B29C48/435 (EP);
B29C48/767 (EP,US);
B29B7/485 (EP);
B29B7/489 (EP);
B29B7/845 (EP);
B29C48/43 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/38] | Title | German: | ENTGASUNGSEXTRUDER MIT EINER MULTISCHNECKENEINHEIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ENTGASUNG VON POLYMERSCHMELZE DAMIT | [2021/38] | English: | DEGASSING EXTRUDER HAVING A MULTI-SCREW UNIT AND METHOD FOR DEGASSING POLYMER MELTS THEREWITH | [2021/38] | French: | EXTRUDEUSE DE DÉGAZAGE DOTÉE D'UNE UNITÉ MULTIVIS ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT LE DÉGAZAGE D'UNE MASSE FONDUE POLYMÈRE | [2021/38] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/38] | 16.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO03033240 (GNEUSS KUNSTSTOFFTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al); | [AD]CN1775506 (UNIV HUANAN TECHNOLOGY [CN]); | [AD]CN101293397 (TAN WEIMING [CN]); | [A]DE102013003380 (GNEUSS GMBH [DE]); | [YA]WO2014183984 (GNEUSS GMBH [DE]); | [YA]WO2016081474 (MOHAWK IND INC [US]) | by applicant | WO03033240 | CN1775506 | CN101293397 | CN101837633 | WO2013180941 |