EP3887406 - WASHING PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Borealis AG Trabrennstrasse 6-8 1020 Vienna / AT | [2022/10] |
Former [2021/40] | For all designated states Borealis AG IZD Tower Wagramerstraße 17-19 1220 Vienna / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATIKAINEN, Pasi Borealis Polymers Oy P.O. Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI | 02 /
HELISEVÄ, Emilia Borealis Polymers Oy P.O. Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI | 03 /
PARJANEN, Jukka-Pekka Borealis Polymers Oy P.O. Box 330 06101 Porvoo / FI | [2021/40] | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2021/40] | Application number, filing date | 19808613.4 | 28.11.2019 | [2021/40] | WO2019EP82872 | Priority number, date | EP20180209613 | 30.11.2018 Original published format: EP 18209613 | [2021/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020109452 | Date: | 04.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3887406 | Date: | 06.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3887406 | Date: | 17.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/00, B01J37/06, B01D21/26, B01J8/00, B01J19/18 | [2021/40] | CPC: |
C08F4/00 (EP);
C08F4/643 (US);
B01D21/267 (EP,US);
B01J19/1856 (EP);
B01J19/1862 (EP);
B01J8/0055 (EP);
C08F10/00 (US);
B01J2208/00787 (EP);
B01J2208/00867 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASCHVERFAHREN | [2021/40] | English: | WASHING PROCESS | [2021/40] | French: | PROCESSUS DE LAVAGE | [2024/14] |
Former [2021/40] | PROCÉDÉ DE LAVAGE | Entry into regional phase | 30.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 30.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/40] | 30.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.06.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5215733 (POTTER JOHN K [GB]); | [Y]JP2007039529 (TOHO CATALYST CO LTD); | [Y]CN106554438 (CHINA PETROLEUM & CHEM CORP, et al) | by applicant | US4107414 | US4186107 | US4226963 | EP0045975 | EP0045976 | EP0045977 | US4347160 | US4382019 | US4435550 | US4465782 | US4472524 | US4473660 | US4522930 | US4530912 | US4532313 | US4560671 | US4581342 | US4657882 | WO8707620 | EP0260130 | EP0376936 | EP0423101 | WO9219659 | WO9219653 | WO9219658 | WO9221705 | EP0537130 | WO9311165 | WO9311166 | WO9319100 | EP0591224 | EP0629631 | EP0629632 | WO9532994 | EP0688794 | US5539067 | US5618771 | EP0776913 | WO9728170 | WO9736939 | EP0810235 | WO9812234 | WO9840331 | WO9846616 | WO9849208 | WO9856831 | WO9912943 | WO9912981 | WO9919335 | WO9933842 | WO9942497 | WO9951646 | WO9961489 | WO0026266 | WO0034341 | WO0048034 | EP1074557 | WO0155230 | WO0202576 | WO0202575 | WO03000757 | WO03000754 | WO03000756 | WO03000755 | WO03010208 | WO03051934 | WO03051514 | WO2004029112 | WO2004085499 | EP1538167 | WO2005105863 | WO2005118655 | WO2006097497 | EP1739103 | EP1752462 | WO2007107448 | WO2007116034 | WO2007137849 | WO2007137853 | WO2009027075 | WO2009054832 | EP2402353 | WO2012001052 | WO2012007430 | EP2532687 | EP2610271 | WO2013098149 | WO2013098137 | WO2013098138 | EP2729479 | EP2746289 | WO2014096296 | WO2016097193 | EP3181220 |