EP3891281 - CRISPR GUIDE-RNA EXPRESSION STRATEGIES FOR MULTIPLEX GENOME ENGINEERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2021/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERWAAL, René P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | 02 /
WIESSENHAAN, Nathalie P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | 03 /
ROUBOS, Johannes Andries P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [2021/41] | Representative(s) | dsm-firmenich IP P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | Application number, filing date | 19808840.3 | 29.11.2019 | [2021/41] | WO2019EP83018 | Priority number, date | EP20180210371 | 05.12.2018 Original published format: EP 18210371 | [2021/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020114893 | Date: | 11.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3891281 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/113, C12N15/85, C12N15/10 | [2021/41] | CPC: |
C12N15/111 (EP,US);
C12N15/81 (US);
C12N1/16 (US);
C12N15/1024 (US);
C12N2310/128 (EP,US);
C12N2310/20 (EP,US);
C12N2310/3519 (EP,US);
C12N2310/51 (EP,US);
C12N2330/51 (EP,US);
C12R2001/865 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] | Title | German: | CRISPR-GUIDE-RNA-EXPRESSIONSSTRATEGIEN FÜR MULTIPLEX-GENOMTECHNIK | [2021/41] | English: | CRISPR GUIDE-RNA EXPRESSION STRATEGIES FOR MULTIPLEX GENOME ENGINEERING | [2021/41] | French: | STRATÉGIES D'EXPRESSION D'ARN GUIDE CRISPR POUR INGÉNIERIE GÉNOMIQUE MULTIPLEX | [2021/41] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/41] | 03.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/42] | 21.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2015153940 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [YD]WO2017037304 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2015099850 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016061481 (PENN STATE RES FOUND [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016110453 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - RENÉ VERWAAL ET AL, "CRISPR/Cpf1 enables fast and simple genome editing of Saccharomyces cerevisiae", YEAST, (20171112), vol. 35, no. 2, doi:10.1002/yea.3278, ISSN 0749-503X, pages 201 - 211, XP055592406 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.3278 | [AD] - D. G. GIBSON, "Synthesis of DNA fragments in yeast by one-step assembly of overlapping oligonucleotides", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (20091101), vol. 37, no. 20, doi:10.1093/nar/gkp687, ISSN 0305-1048, pages 6984 - 6990, XP055343126 [AD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkp687 | [A] - OWEN W RYAN ET AL, "Selection of chromosomal DNA libraries using a multiplex CRISPR system", ELIFE, (20140819), vol. 3, doi:10.7554/eLife.03703, pages 1 - 15, XP055175718 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7554/eLife.03703 | [A] - OWEN W RYAN* ET AL, "Multiplex Engineering of Industrial Yeast Genomes Using CRISPRm", METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (2014), vol. 546, pages 473 - 489, XP009183140 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [T] - KLAUDIA CIURKOT ET AL, "CRISPR/Cas12a Multiplex Genome Editing of Saccharomyces cerevisiae and the Creation of Yeast Pixel Art", JOURNAL OF VISUALIZED EXPERIMENTS, (201905), vol. 147, doi:10.3791/59350, pages 1 - 15, XP055667175 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3791/59350 | by applicant | WO2008000632 | WO2006077258 | WO2010102982 | WO2010121933 | WO2014130955 | WO2008053019 | WO2005005672 | WO2005026356 | WO2006040340 | WO2017037304 | WO2013144257 | - NIELSEN et al., Science, (19910000), vol. 254, pages 1497 - 1500 | - GOVINDARAJUKUMAR, Chem. Commun, (20050000), pages 495 - 497 | - EGHOLM et al., Nature, (19930000), vol. 365, pages 566 - 568 | - MORITA et al., Nucleic Acid Res, (20010000), pages 241 - 242 | - CARILLO, H.LIPMAN, D., SIAM J. Applied Math., (19880000), vol. 48, page 1073 | - ZRENNER RWILLMITZER LSONNEWALD U, "Analysis of the expression of potato uridinediphosphate-glucose pyrophosphorylase and its inhibition by antisense RNA", Planta, (19930000), vol. 190, no. 2, pages 247 - 52 | - CARREL F.L.Y.CANEVASCINI G., Canadian Journal of Microbiology, (19910000), vol. 37, no. 6, pages 459 - 464 | - DEVEREUX, J. et al., Nucleic Acids Research, (19840000), vol. 12, no. 1, page 387 | - ALTSCHUL, S. F. et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - NEEDLEMANWUNSCH, J. Mol. Biol., (19700000), vol. 48, pages 443 - 453 | - HENTIKOFFHENTIKOFF, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA., (19920000), vol. 89, pages 10915 - 10919 | - HOUBRAKENSAMSON, Studies in Mycology, (20110000), vol. 70, pages 1 - 51 | - YOUNGDONG, Nucleic Acids Research, (20040000), vol. 32, no. 7 | - GUPTA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci USA, (19680000), vol. 60, pages 1338 - 1344 | - SCARPULLA et al., Anal. Biochem., (19820000), vol. 121, pages 356 - 365 | - STEMMER et al., Gene, (19890415), vol. 164, no. 1, pages 51 - 53 | - CHAVEROCHE, M-K.GHICO, J-M.ENFERT C, "A rapid method for efficient gene replacement in the filamentous fungus Aspergillus nidulans", Nucleic acids Research, (20000000), vol. 28, no. 22, doi:10.1093/nar/28.22.e97, XP002371804 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/28.22.e97 | - Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20000200), vol. 66, no. 2, pages 775 - 82 | - TOUR O. et al., Nat. Biotech: Genetically targeted chromophore-assisted light inactivation, (20030000), vol. 21, no. 12, pages 1505 - 1508 | - R.S. KAMATH, Nature: Systematic functional analysis of the Caenorhabditis elegans genome using RNAi, (20030000), vol. 421, pages 231 - 237 | - RAMONLUCAS, J.MARTINEZ OPEREZ P.ISABEL LOPEZ, M.VALENCIANO, S.LABORDA, F., "The Aspergillus nidulans carnitine carrier encoded by the acuH gene is exclusively located in the mitochondria", FEMS Microbiol Lett., (20010724), vol. 201, no. 2, pages 193 - 8, XP027360520 | - DERKX, P. M.MADRID, S. M., "The foldase CYPB is a component of the secretory pathway of Aspergillus niger and contains the endoplasmic reticulum retention signal HEEL", Mol. Genet. Genomics, (20011200), vol. 266, no. 4, pages 537 - 545 | - MATTERN, I.E.VAN NOORT J.M.VAN DEN BERG, P.ARCHER, D. B.ROBERTS, I.N.VAN DEN HONDEL, C. A., "Isolation and characterization of mutants of Aspergillus niger deficient in extracellular proteases", Mol Gen Genet, (19920800), vol. 234, no. 2, doi:10.1007/BF00283855, pages 332 - 6, XP002127868 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00283855 | - REESE E.T.PARRISH F.W.ETTLINGER M., Carbohydrate Research, (19710000), pages 381 - 388 | - CRESS BFTOPARLAK ODGULERIA SLEBOVICH MSTIEGLITZ JTENGLAENDER JAJONES JALINHARDT RJKOFFAS MA, "CRISPathBrick: Modular Combinatorial Assembly of Type II-A CRISPR Arrays for dCas9-Mediated Multiplex Transcriptional Repression in E. coli", ACS Synth Biol., (20150918), vol. 4, no. 9, doi:10.1021/acssynbio.5b00012, pages 987 - 1000, XP055469356 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acssynbio.5b00012 | - DEANER MMEJIA JALPER HS, "Enabling Graded and Large-Scale Multiplex of Desired Genes Using a Dual-Mode dCas9 Activator in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", ACS Synth Biol., (20171020), vol. 6, no. 10, pages 1931 - 1943 | - DEANER MHOLZMAN AALPER HS, "Modular Ligation Extension of Guide RNA Operons (LEGO) for Multiplexed dCas9 Regulation of Metabolic Pathways in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", Biotechnol J., (20180900), vol. 13, no. 9, page e1700582 | - DICARLO JENORVILLE JEMALI PRIOS XAACH JCHURCH GM, "Genome engineering in Saccharomyces cerevisiae using CRISPR-Cas systems", Nucleic Acids Res., (20130400), vol. 41, no. 7, doi:10.1093/nar/gkt135, pages 4336 - 43, XP055086617 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkt135 | - FLAGFELDT DBSIEWERS VHUANG LNIELSEN J, "Characterization of chromosomal integration sites for heterologous gene expression in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", Yeast, (20091000), vol. 26, no. 10, pages 545 - 51 | - FONFARA IRICHTER HBRATOVIC MLE RHUN ACHARPENTIER E, "The CRISPR-associated DNA-cleaving enzyme Cpf1 also processes precursor CRISPR RNA", Nature, (20160428), vol. 532, no. 7600, doi:10.1038/nature17945, pages 517 - 21, XP055349049 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature17945 | - GAO YZHAO Y, "Self-processing of ribozyme-flanked RNAs into guide RNAs in vitro and in vivo for CRISPR-mediated genome editing", J Integr Plant Biol., (20140400), vol. 56, no. 4, doi:10.1111/jipb.12152, pages 343 - 9, XP055175728 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/jipb.12152 | - GIBSON DG, "Synthesis of DNA fragments in yeast by one-step assembly of overlapping oligonucleotides", Nucleic Acids Res., (20091100), vol. 37, no. 20, doi:10.1093/nar/gkp687, pages 6984 - 90, XP055343126 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkp687 | - GIETZ RDWOODS RA, "Transformation of yeast by lithium acetate/single-stranded carrier DNA/polyethylene glycol method", Methods Enzymol., (20020000), vol. 350, pages 87 - 96, XP008068319 | - HAURWITZ, R. E.JINEK, M.WIEDENHEFT, B.ZHOU, K.DOUDNA, J. A., "Sequence-and structure-specific RNA processing by a CRISPR endonuclease", Science, (20100000), vol. 329, doi:10.1126/science.1192272, page 1355, XP055244668 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1192272 | - HAURWITZ, R. E.STERNBERG, S. H.DOUDNA, J. A., "Csy4 relies on an unusual catalytic dyad to position and cleave CRISPR RNA", EMBO J., (20120000), vol. 31, doi:10.1038/emboj.2012.107, page 2824, XP055153085 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/emboj.2012.107 | - HUR JKKIM KBEEN KWBAEK GYE SHUR JWRYU SMLEE YSKIM JS, "Targeted mutagenesis in mice by electroporation of Cpf1 ribonucleoproteins", Nat Biotechnol., (20160800), vol. 34, no. 8, doi:10.1038/nbt.3596, pages 807 - 8, XP055465092 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.3596 | - KIM YCHEONG SALEE JGLEE SWLEE MSBAEK IJSUNG YH, "Generation of knockout mice by Cpf1-mediated gene targeting", Nat Biotechnol., (20160800), vol. 34, no. 8, pages 808 - 10 | - KIM HKIM STRYU JKANG BCKIM JSKIM SG, "CRISPR/Cpf1-mediated DNA-free plant genome editing", Nat Commun., (20170216), vol. 8, page 14406 | - KIM HKSONG MLEE JMENON AVJUNG SKANG YMCHOI JWWOO EKOH HCNAM JW, "In vivo high-throughput profiling of CRISPR-Cpf1 activity", Nat Methods, (20170200), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:10.1038/nmeth.4104, pages 153 - 159, XP055434289 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.4104 | - KNOTT GJDOUDNA JA, "CRISPR-Cas guides the future of genetic engineering", Science, (20180831), vol. 361, no. 6405, pages 866 - 869 | - LIAN JHAMEDIRAD MHU SZHAO H, "Combinatorial metabolic engineering using an orthogonal tri-functional CRISPR system", Nat Commun., (20171122), vol. 8, no. 1, page 1688 | - LIAN JHAMEDIRAD MZHAO H, "Advancing Metabolic Engineering of Saccharomyces cerevisiae Using the CRISPR/Cas System", Biotechnol J., (20180900), vol. 13, no. 9, page e1700601 | - CHUNYU LIAOFANI TTOFALIREBECCA A SLOTKOWSKISTEVEN R DENNYTAYLOR D CECILRYAN T LEENAYALBERT J KEUNGCHASE L BEISEL, "One-step assembly of large CRISPR arrays enables multi-functional targeting and reveals constraints on array design", BioRxiv, (20180502), URL: https://doi.org/10.1101/312421 | - LOOKE MKRISTJUHAN KKRISTJUHAN A, "Extraction of genomic DNA from yeasts for PCR-based applications", Biotechniques, (20110500), vol. 50, no. 5, pages 325 - 8 | - MAHFOUZ MM, "The efficient tool CRISPR-Cpf1", Genome editing: Nat Plants, (20170303), vol. 3, page 17028 | - MAKAROVA KSWOLF YIALKHNBASHI OSCOSTA FSHAH SASAUNDERS SJBARRANGOU RBROUNS SJCHARPENTIER EHAFT DH, "An updated evolutionary classification of CRISPR-Cas systems", Nat Rev Microbiol., (20151100), vol. 13, no. 11, doi:10.1038/nrmicro3569, pages 722 - 36, XP055271841 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrmicro3569 | - MAKAROVA KSZHANG FKOONIN EV, "SnapShot: Class 2 CRISPR-Cas Systems", Cell, (20170112), vol. 168, no. 1-2, pages 328 - 328 | - NAKAMURA YGOJOBORI TIKEMURA T., "Codon usage tabulated from international DNA sequence databases: status for the year 2000", Nucleic Acids Res., (20000101), vol. 28, no. 1, doi:10.1093/nar/28.1.292, page 292, XP002941557 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/28.1.292 | - NISSIM LPERLI SDFRIDKIN APEREZ-PINERA PLU TK, "Multiplexed and programmable regulation of gene networks with an integrated RNA and CRISPR/Cas toolkit in human cells", Biotechnol J. Mol Cell, (20140522), vol. 54, no. 4, doi:10.1016/j.molcel.2014.04.022, pages 698 - 710, XP029028594 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molcel.2014.04.022 | - ORR-WEAVER TLSZOSTAK JWROTHSTEIN RJ, "Genetic applications of yeast transformation with linear and gapped plasmids", Methods Enzymol., (19830000), vol. 101, pages 228 - 45 | - PORT FBULLOCK SL, "Augmenting CRISPR applications in Drosophila with tRNA-flanked sgRNAs", Nat Methods, (20161000), vol. 13, no. 10, doi:10.1038/nmeth.3972, pages 852 - 4, XP055344550 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.3972 | - SIKORSKI RSHIETER P, "A system of shuttle vectors and yeast host strains designed for efficient manipulation of DNA in Saccharomyces cerevisiae", Genetics, (19890500), vol. 122, no. 1, pages 19 - 27 | - SWARTS DCJINEK M, "Cas9 versus Cas12a/Cpf1: Structure-function comparisons and implications for genome editing", Wiley Interdiscip Rev RNA, (20180522), page e1481 | - SWIAT MADASHKO SDEN RIDDER MWIJSMAN MVAN DER OOST JDARAN JMDARAN-LAPUJADE P, "FnCpf1: a novel and efficient genome editing tool for Saccharomyces cerevisiae", Nucleic Acids Res., (20171201), vol. 45, no. 21, pages 12585 - 12598 | - TAK YEKLEINSTIVER BPNUNEZ JKHSU JYHORNG JEGONG JWEISSMAN JSJOUNG JK, "Inducible and multiplex gene regulation using CRISPR-Cpf1-based transcription factors", Nat Methods, (20171200), vol. 14, no. 12, doi:10.1038/nmeth.4483, pages 1163 - 1166, XP055577287 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nmeth.4483 | - VAN DIJKEN JPBAUER JBRAMBILLA LDUBOC PFRANCOIS JMGANCEDO CGIUSEPPIN MLHEIJNEN JJHOARE MLANGE HC, "An interlaboratory comparison of physiological and genetic properties of four Saccharomyces cerevisiae strains", Enzyme Microb Technol., (20000601), vol. 26, no. 9-10, doi:10.1016/S0141-0229(00)00162-9, pages 706 - 714, XP027457427 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-0229(00)00162-9 | - VERCOE RBCHANG JTDY RLTAYLOR CGRISTWOOD TCLULOW JSRICHTER CPRZYBILSKI RPITMAN ARFINERAN PC, "Cytotoxic chromosomal targeting by CRISPR/Cas systems can reshape bacterial genomes and expel or remodel pathogenicity islands", PLoS Genet, (20130400), vol. 9, no. 4, doi:10.1371/journal.pgen.1003454, page e1003454, XP055354768 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pgen.1003454 | - VERWAAL RWANG JMEIJNEN JPVISSER HSANDMANN GVAN DEN BERG JAVAN OOYEN AJ, "High-level production of beta-carotene in Saccharomyces cerevisiae by successive transformation with carotenogenic genes from Xanthophyllomyces dendrorhous", Appl Environ Microbiol., (20070700), vol. 73, no. 13, doi:10.1128/AEM.02759-06, pages 4342 - 50, XP002587086 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.02759-06 | - VERWAAL RBUITING-WIESSENHAAN NDALHUIJSEN SROUBOS JA, "CRISPR/Cpf1 enables fast and simple genome editing of Saccharomyces cerevisiae", Yeast, (20180200), vol. 35, no. 2, doi:10.1002/yea.3278, pages 201 - 211, XP055592406 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/yea.3278 | - WANG MMAO YLU YTAO XZHU JK, "Multiplex Gene Editing in Rice Using the CRISPR-Cpf1 System", Mol Plant., (20170705), vol. 10, no. 7, doi:10.1016/j.molp.2017.03.001, pages 1011 - 1013, XP055512018 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.molp.2017.03.001 | - XU RQIN RLI HLI DLI LWEI PYANG J, "Generation of targeted mutant rice using a CRISPR-Cpf1 system", Plant Biotechnol J., (20170600), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1111/pbi.12669, pages 713 - 717, XP055530604 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/pbi.12669 | - ZETSCHE BGOOTENBERG JSABUDAYYEH 00SLAYMAKER IMMAKAROVA KSESSLETZBICHLER PVOLZ SEJOUNG JVAN DER OOST JREGEV A, "Cpf1 is a single RNA-guided endonuclease of a class 2 CRISPR-Cas system", Cell, (20151022), vol. 163, no. 3, doi:10.1016/j.cell.2015.09.038, pages 759 - 71, XP055553375 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cell.2015.09.038 | - ZETSCHE BHEIDENREICH MMOHANRAJU PFEDOROVA IKNEPPERS JDEGENNARO EMWINBLAD NCHOUDHURY SRABUDAYYEH 00GOOTENBERG JS, Nat Biotechnol., (20170100), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 31 - 34 | - ZIEHLER WADAY JJFIERKE CAENGELKE DR, "Effects of 5' leader and 3' trailer structures on pre-tRNA processing by nuclear RNase P", Biochemistry, (20000815), vol. 39, no. 32, pages 9909 - 16 |