EP3908498 - CONVEYING DEVICE, PROCESSING INSTALLATION, METHOD FOR CONVEYING AND/OR PROCESSING OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.07.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 04.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dürr Systems AG Carl-Benz-Straße 34 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | [2023/36] |
Former [2021/46] | For all designated states Dürr Systems AG Carl-Benz-Straße 34 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUER, Michael Hindenburgstraße 43/2 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 02 /
BARTSCH, Dirk Karlstr. 35 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | 03 /
REMPP, Peter Traminerweg 5 75031 Eppingen / DE | 04 /
FRASCH, Benny Eisenbahnstr. 14 71282 Hemmingen / DE | 05 /
WEIDLE, Martin Malvenweg 3 70839 Gerlingen / DE | 06 /
BAYHA, Johannes Wallstraße 1/1 71364 Winnenden / DE | 07 /
BELL, Stefano Iltisweg 15 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | [2023/36] |
Former [2021/46] | 01 /
LAUER, Michael 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | ||
02 /
BARTSCH, Dirk 74321 Bietigheim-Bissingen / DE | |||
03 /
REMPP, Peter 75031 Eppingen / DE | |||
04 /
FRASCH, Benny 71282 Hemmingen / DE | |||
05 /
WEIDLE, Martin 70839 Gerlingen / DE | |||
06 /
BAYHA, Johannes 71364 Winnenden / DE | |||
07 /
BELL, Stefano 70806 Kornwestheim / DE | Representative(s) | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/36] | DTS Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schnekenbühl und Partner mbB Brienner Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2021/46] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 19809066.4 | 25.11.2019 | [2021/46] | WO2019EP82392 | Priority number, date | DE201910200311 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019200311 | DE201920100145U | 11.01.2019 Original published format: DE 202019100145 U | DE201910200307 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019200307 | DE201910200308 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019200308 | DE201910200310 | 11.01.2019 Original published format: DE102019200310 | DE201910206729 | 09.05.2019 Original published format: DE102019206729 | [2021/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020143949 | Date: | 16.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3908498 | Date: | 17.11.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3908498 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.07.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B62D53/00, B62D65/18 | [2023/15] | CPC: |
B62D65/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B62D53/005 (EP,KR,US);
B62D63/02 (CN);
B60L53/16 (CN);
B60S1/62 (CN);
B62D63/04 (CN);
B65G35/06 (US);
B65G43/00 (US);
B65G47/00 (US);
B65G47/52 (US);
B65G67/02 (US);
B65G69/2876 (US);
B60L2200/36 (CN);
B65G2201/0294 (US);
B65G2203/0233 (US);
B65G2203/042 (US);
B65G2207/40 (US);
B65G2814/03 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/46] | B62D1/18, B62D65/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÖRDERVORRICHTUNG, BEARBEITUNGSANLAGE, VERFAHREN ZUM FÖRDERN UND/ODER BEARBEITEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2021/46] | English: | CONVEYING DEVICE, PROCESSING INSTALLATION, METHOD FOR CONVEYING AND/OR PROCESSING OBJECTS | [2021/46] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONVOYAGE, ATELIER DE TRAITEMENT, PROCÉDÉ DE CONVOYAGE ET/OU DE TRAITEMENT D'OBJETS | [2021/46] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/46] | 06.08.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
29.05.2024
30.05.2024
ADMISSIBLE Benninger, Johannes An der Brunnstube 3a 93051 Regensburg / DE | 02
03.06.2024
04.06.2024
ADMISSIBLE Eisenmann GmbH Tübingerstrasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE Opponent's representative Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Azenbergstraße 35 70174 Stuttgart / DE | 03
03.06.2024
04.06.2024
ADMISSIBLE SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
29.05.2024
30.05.2024
ADMISSIBLE Benninger, Johannes An der Brunnstube 3a 93051 Regensburg / DE | 19.07.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | MC | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | LU | 25.11.2023 | CH | 30.11.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | DK | 06.09.2023 | |
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
LU | 25.11.2023 | ||
CH | 30.11.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | DK | 06.09.2023 | |
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | EE | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
MC | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | EE | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4137984 (JENNINGS FREDERICK R, et al); | [XI]DE60302802T (MAXMOVE IND AB [SE]); | [XI]US2012205175 (MASSERANG KEITH [US], et al); | [XI]DE102011109597 (DAIMLER AG [DE]); | [XI]DE102013113729 (DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) | Opposition | DE202005004466U | US2005232729 | DE102004047209 | EP2889713 | WO2015121818 | US2016376136 | DE102015220495 | DE102016113312 | EP3704001 | US4137984 | DE60302802T | US2008071429 | EP2339376 | EP2386876 | DE102011085019 | US2012205175 | DE102011109597 | EP2722687 | DE102013113729 | AU2014338685B | DE102017103931 | WO2018234105 |