Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11482920 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2022 | B2 | US2021367503 | 25.11.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862760165 | 13.11.2018 | US201915734181 | 30.10.2019 | WO2019US58848 | 30.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112313863 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201862760165 | 13.11.2018 | WO2019US58848 | 30.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3881417 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2024 | B1 | EP3881417 | 22.09.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862760165 | 13.11.2018 | WO2019US58848 | 30.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020101896 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862760165 | 13.11.2018 |