EP3805016 - PNEUMATIC TIRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 1-1 Kyobashi 3-Chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Taichi c/o BRIDGESTONE CORPORATION, 1-1, Kyobashi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Oxley, Robin John George Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19810335.0 | 29.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019JP21235 | Priority number, date | JP20180105507 | 31.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018105507 | [2021/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019230770 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805016 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/18, B60C9/22, B60C9/20 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
B60C9/185 (EP);
B60C9/22 (EP,US);
B60C9/28 (US);
B60C2009/1878 (EP);
B60C2009/2058 (EP);
B60C2009/2064 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | B60C9/18, B60C9/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | LUFTREIFEN | [2021/15] | English: | PNEUMATIC TIRE | [2021/15] | French: | PNEU | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2020 | Translation filed | 30.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 27.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/11] | 25.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2123480 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0013] , [0018] , [0 19]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1872972 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0026]; figure -; claim - *; | [A]JPH06255314 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0002]; figure -; claim - * | International search | [A]JPH06255314 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0005], [0008]-[0011], fig. 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2002154307 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-7 * , claims, paragraphs [0029], [0032]-[0035], fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH1035220 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , claims, paragraphs [0008]-[0017], fig. 1, 2 (Family: none) *; | [A]WO2017200061 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0050]-[0056], fig. 6 & JP 2017-206207 A & EP 3459761 A1 & CN 109153289 A *; | [A]WO2018012640 (BRIDGESTONE CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , paragraphs [0081]-[0086], fig. 1 & JP 2018-8662 A & CN 109476182 A *; | [A]JP2000318409 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * , whole document (Family: none) *; | [A]JPS61119406 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 1-7 * , whole document (Family: none) * |