Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11745352 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2023 | B2 | US2021016448 | 21.01.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018102264 | 29.05.2018 | WO2019JP18547 | 09.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN111971523B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2022 | B | CN111971523 | 20.11.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018102264 | 29.05.2018 | WO2019JP18547 | 09.05.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3805695 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2024 | B1 | EP3805695 | 02.03.2022 | A4 | EP3805695 | 14.04.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018102264 | 29.05.2018 | WO2019JP18547 | 09.05.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019230320 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2018102264 | 29.05.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7052564B | Global Dossier | 12.04.2022 | B2 | JP2019207140 | 05.12.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2018102264 | 29.05.2018 |