EP3802940 - A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR THE APPLICATION OF CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS TO NATURAL FIBERS AND TREATED FIBERS OBTAINED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Argaman Technologies Ltd. HaArig 6 Migdal HaEmek, 2390406 / IL | [2024/27] |
Former [2021/15] | For all designated states Argaman Technologies Ltd. P.O. Box 10197 911102 Jerusalem / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GABBAY, Jeffrey S. 14 Jabotinsky Street, apartment 21 9214207 Jerusalem / IL | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Schulz Junghans Patentanwälte PartGmbB Großbeerenstraße 71 10963 Berlin / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19810435.8 | 30.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019IL50618 | Priority number, date | US201862678280P | 31.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862678280 P | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019229756 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802940 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3802940 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | D06B13/00 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
D06M10/06 (EP,IL,US);
D06B13/00 (EP,IL);
D06M11/42 (EP,IL,US);
D06B1/14 (EP,IL);
D06B15/02 (EP,IL);
D06M10/02 (EP,IL);
D06M10/04 (EP,IL);
D06M11/44 (EP,IL);
D06M11/45 (EP,IL);
D06M11/46 (EP,IL);
D06M11/74 (EP,IL);
D06M11/76 (EP,IL);
D06M11/79 (EP,IL);
D06M13/196 (EP,IL);
D06M15/643 (EP,IL);
D06M16/00 (EP,IL);
D06M23/08 (EP,IL,US);
D06M23/12 (EP,IL,US);
D06M2101/06 (EP,IL,US);
D06M2200/00 (IL,US);
D06M2200/12 (EP,IL);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM AUFBRINGEN VON CHEMISCHEN VERBINDUNGEN AUF NATURFASERN UND DARAUS ERHALTENE BEHANDELTE FASERN | [2021/15] | English: | A METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR THE APPLICATION OF CHEMICAL COMPOUNDS TO NATURAL FIBERS AND TREATED FIBERS OBTAINED THEREFROM | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'APPLICATION DE COMPOSÉS CHIMIQUES À DES FIBRES NATURELLES ET FIBRES TRAITÉES OBTENUES PAR LESDITS PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 04.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2023 | Observations by third parties | 04.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2015140047 (GREENWALD JERRY [IL]); | [XY]WO2018038627 (KAMLER ANNA VLADIMIROVNA [RU], et al); | EP3505166 [ ] (KAMLER ANNA VLADIMIROVNA [RU], et al) | International search | [DX]US2015140047 (GREENWALD JERRY [IL]); | other | WO9835095 | WO2008131821 |