EP3805112 - FILLING NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, 5-chome Ukima Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIZAWA, Shaw c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha, 5-1, Ukima 5-chome, Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19811082.7 | 28.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019JP21115 | Priority number, date | JP20180101787 | 28.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018101787 | [2021/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019230725 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805112 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B65B39/00, A61K39/395, B67C3/02, // A61K39/00, B01J4/02 | [2022/10] | CPC: |
B65B3/003 (EP,KR,US);
B65B39/00 (EP,KR,US);
B05B15/50 (KR);
B05B15/525 (EP,KR,US);
B05B15/65 (KR,US);
B65B3/04 (KR,US);
B65B3/14 (EP);
B65B3/36 (EP);
B67C3/02 (KR);
B67C3/28 (EP);
C08L23/08 (KR);
C08L45/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | B65B39/00, A61K39/395, B67C3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | FÜLLDÜSE | [2021/15] | English: | FILLING NOZZLE | [2021/15] | French: | BUSE DE REMPLISSAGE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 03.12.2020 | Translation filed | 23.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 31.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0278560 (SHIKOKU KAKOKI CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP1232753 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]US2003155384 (NAGAHATA KUNIYOSHI [JP], et al); | [XD]JP2004217215 (FUJIMORI KOGYO CO); | [Y]JP2006220645 (INOUE MTP KK); | [X]JP2006223944 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [Y]JP2015140186 (AKIMOTO SANKI KK); | [Y]KR20150114754 (CHOI JONG YUN [KR], et al); | [XY]EP3055003 (OCUJECT LLC [US]); | [X]WO2017073533 (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]); | [Y]US2017197024 (KIMINAMI HIDEAKI [JP], et al); | [XI]WO2017137470 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE]); | [Y]WO2017188061 (BIOFUTURE TECH LTD [JP], et al); | [XY]US2018133375 (SHIOZAKI RIEKO [JP], et al) | International search | [XA]JP2004217215 (FUJIMORI KOGYO CO); | [XA]JP2006223944 (OLYMPUS CORP); | [A]JP2013086826 (TETRA PAK JAPAN); | [A]JP2015134639 (TOYO INK SC HOLDINGS CO LTD); | [XA]WO2017073533 (KONICA MINOLTA INC [JP]); | [A]JP2017190188 (ALBEA LE TREPORT) | by applicant | WO9219759 | JPH05300939 | JPH05317411 | WO9813388 | WO9814580 | WO9951743 | WO0233072 | JP2003237734 | JP2004217215 | WO2005005636 | WO2006006693 | WO2009041621 | WO2009072604 | JP2010189029 | WO2012067176 |