EP3810116 - NOVEL SUBSTITUTED [1.1.1] BICYCLO COMPOUNDS AS INDOLEAMINE 2,3-DIOXYGENASE INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | [2022/42] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Road Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HE, Shuwen 158 Second Street Fanwood, New Jersey 07023 / US | 02 /
CLAUSEN, Dane 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 03 /
GUO, Liangqin 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 04 /
HAN, Yongxin 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 05 /
HUANG, Xianhai 16 Hemlock Circle Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US | 06 /
PASTERNAK, Alexander 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 07 /
PU, Qinglin 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | 08 /
XIAO, Dong 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 09 /
XIAO, Li 2000 Galloping Hill Road Kenilworth, New Jersey 07033 / US | 10 /
ZHANG, Hongjun 33 Avenue Louis Pasteur Boston, Massachusetts 02115-5727 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [2023/46] |
Former [2021/17] | Hussain, Deeba Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | Application number, filing date | 19811446.4 | 28.05.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US34088 | Priority number, date | US201862678568P | 31.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862678568 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019231870 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810116 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3810116 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D237/34, C07D239/42, C07D239/70, C07D239/94, C07D241/20, C07D471/04, C07C237/14, A61K31/166, A61P25/00, A61P31/12, A61P35/00 | [2022/01] | CPC: |
A61P31/12 (EP);
C07C271/14 (US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07C237/14 (EP);
C07D213/74 (EP,US);
C07D237/34 (EP,US);
C07D239/42 (EP,US);
C07D239/70 (EP);
C07D239/94 (EP,US);
C07D241/20 (EP,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | A61K31/166, C07C13/08, C07C233/65 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUARTIGE SUBSTITUIERTE [1.1.1]-BICYCLO-VERBINDUNGEN ALS INDOLAMIN-2,3-DIOXYGENASE-INHIBITOREN | [2021/17] | English: | NOVEL SUBSTITUTED [1.1.1] BICYCLO COMPOUNDS AS INDOLEAMINE 2,3-DIOXYGENASE INHIBITORS | [2021/17] | French: | NOUVEAUX COMPOSÉS [1,1,1]BICYCLO SUBSTITUÉS EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE L'INDOLÉAMINE 2,3-DIOXYGÉNASE | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 30.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2023 | CZ | 15.11.2023 | DK | 15.11.2023 | EE | 15.11.2023 | ES | 15.11.2023 | HR | 15.11.2023 | IT | 15.11.2023 | LT | 15.11.2023 | LV | 15.11.2023 | NL | 15.11.2023 | PL | 15.11.2023 | RO | 15.11.2023 | RS | 15.11.2023 | SE | 15.11.2023 | SK | 15.11.2023 | SM | 15.11.2023 | BG | 15.02.2024 | NO | 15.02.2024 | GR | 16.02.2024 | IS | 15.03.2024 | PT | 15.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
CZ | 15.11.2023 | ||
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RO | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
EE | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
DK | 15.11.2023 | ||
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
SM | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
LV | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
HR | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
PL | 15.11.2023 | ||
RS | 15.11.2023 | ||
SE | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
NO | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 15.11.2023 | |
ES | 15.11.2023 | ||
LT | 15.11.2023 | ||
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
PT | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 15.11.2023 | |
NL | 15.11.2023 | ||
BG | 15.02.2024 | ||
GR | 16.02.2024 | ||
IS | 15.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 16.02.2024 | |
IS | 15.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2016165613 (HANGZHOU INNOGATE PHARMA CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-21 * claims 1,20,27,31 *; | [E]WO2019204180 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [E] 1-21 * claims 1,18 *; | [E]WO2019231871 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [US], et al) [E] 1-21 * claims 1,16 *; | [A] - JAE EUN CHEONG ET AL, "A patent review of IDO1 inhibitors for cancer", EXPERT OPINION ON THERAPEUTIC PATENTS, GB, (20180223), vol. 28, no. 4, doi:10.1080/13543776.2018.1441290, ISSN 1354-3776, pages 317 - 330, XP055544298 [A] 1-21 * page 323; compounds 36-37 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/13543776.2018.1441290 | International search | [A]US2016075654 (BUNKER KEVIN DUANE [US], et al) [A] 1-16, 18 * , entire document, especially: para [0238], formula 21-3. *; | [A] - PubChem, (20180129), Database accession no. 132090779 [A] 1-16, 18 * , pg 2, Fig. * | [A] - NELP et al., "Immune-modulating enzyme indoleamine-2,3-dioxygenase is effectively inhibited by targeting its apo-form", Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, (20180327), vol. 115, no. 13, doi:10.1073/pnas.1719190115, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 3249 - 3254, XP055643566 [A] 1-16, 18 * , entire document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1719190115 | by applicant | WO0102369 | WO0210192 | WO02068470 | WO2004004771 | WO2004056875 | WO2004072286 | US7488802 | US7521051 | WO2010027827 | WO2010077634 | WO2011066342 | US8008449 | US2011271358 | US8168757 | US8354509 | WO2013019906 | US8383796 | WO2016165613 | WO2019204180 | WO2019231871 | - DAUBENER et al., Adv. Exp. Med. Biol, (19990000), vol. 467, pages 517 - 24 | - TAYLOR et al., FASEB J., (19910000), vol. 5, pages 2516 - 22 | - LOGAN et al., Immunology, (20020000), vol. 105, pages 478 - 87 | - BROWN et al., Adv. Exp. Med. Biol, (19910000), vol. 294, pages 425 - 35 | - PORTULA et al., Blood, (20050000), vol. 106, pages 2382 - 90 | - MEDAWAR, Symp. Soc. Exp. Biol., (19530000), vol. 7, pages 320 - 38 | - MOAN et al., Science, (19980000), vol. 281, pages 1191 - 3 | - UYTTENHOVE et al., Nature Med., (20030000), vol. 9, pages 1269 - 74 | - MULLER et al., Nature Med., (20050000), vol. 11, pages 312 - 9 | - MUNN et al., Science, (20020000), vol. 297, pages 1867 - 70 | - MUNN et al., J. Clin. Invest, (20040000), vol. 114, no. 2, pages 280 - 90 | - GROHMANN et al., Trends Immunol, (20030000), vol. 24, pages 242 - 8 | - WIRLEITNER et al., Curr. Med. Chem., (20030000), vol. 10, pages 1581 - 91 | - "NCBI", the American Pharmaceutical Association and the Pharmaceutical Press, Database accession no. NP_079515 |