Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
16.04.2025 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
05.04.2025 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
26.03.2025 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
10.12.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
06.12.2024 | First examination report | |
15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
24.03.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.03.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.02.2022 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
28.01.2022 | Change - classification | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
28.01.2022 | Change - classification | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] |
06.08.2021 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
06.08.2021 | Change - extension states | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] |
30.03.2021 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.03.2021 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
12.03.2021 | Request for examination filed | published on 14.04.2021 [2021/15] |
22.02.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
15.01.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
24.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.12.2020 | Change - representative | |
18.12.2020 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
18.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant | |
07.12.2019 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
07.12.2019 | New entry: applicant or inventor |