EP3805954 - METHOD FOR SHARING KNOWLEDGE BETWEEN DIALOG SYSTEMS, AND DIALOG METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2022 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ai Speech Co., Ltd. No. 14 Building, Ascendas IHub No. 388 Xinping Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GE, Fujiang No. 14 Building, Ascendas Ihub No. 388 Xinping Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 02 /
CHU, Min No. 14 Building, Ascendas Ihub No. 388 Xinping Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 03 /
GUO, Taotao No. 14 Building, Ascendas Ihub No. 388 Xinping Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 04 /
DAI, Zhongyuan No. 14 Building, Ascendas Ihub No. 388 Xinping Street Suzhou Industrial Park Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Hautier IP - MC/EP 17, avenue Albert II C/º The Office & Co - L'ALBU 98000 Monaco / MC | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Hautier IP 1, Rue du Gabian Le Thalès - 12 Etg - Bloc A 98000 Monaco / MC | Application number, filing date | 19811963.8 | 21.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019CN87808 | Priority number, date | CN201810536554 | 30.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810536554 | [2021/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019228232 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805954 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N5/02, G06N5/04, G06F16/90 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
G06N5/022 (EP,CN,US);
G06F40/205 (US);
G06F40/216 (EP);
G06F40/30 (EP);
G06F40/35 (EP);
G06N5/04 (EP,US);
H04L51/02 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | G06F16/90, G06N5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TEILEN VON WISSEN ZWISCHEN DIALOGSYSTEMEN SOWIE DIALOGVERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG | [2021/15] | English: | METHOD FOR SHARING KNOWLEDGE BETWEEN DIALOG SYSTEMS, AND DIALOG METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PARTAGE DE CONNAISSANCES ENTRE DES SYSTÈMES DE DIALOGUE, ET PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE DIALOGUE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2020 | Translation filed | 15.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I] - HUSSAIN SHAFQUAT ET AL, "Extending a Conventional Chatbot Knowledge Base to External Knowledge Source and Introducing User Based Sessions for Diabetes Education", 2018 32ND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ADVANCED INFORMATION NETWORKING AND APPLICATIONS WORKSHOPS (WAINA), IEEE, (20180516), doi:10.1109/WAINA.2018.00170, pages 698 - 703, XP033375852 [I] 1-10 * figures 2, 3 * * section III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WAINA.2018.00170 | [I] - DINGLI ALEXIEI ET AL, Building a Hybrid: Chatterbot - Dialog System, ADVANCES IN BIOMETRICS : INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE, ICB 2007, SEOUL, KOREA, AUGUST 27 - 29, 2007 ; PROCEEDINGS; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE; LECT.NOTES COMPUTER], SPRINGER, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 145 - 152, (20130901), ISBN 978-3-540-74549-5, XP047039023 [I] 1,7,9,10 * figure 1 * * section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-40585-3_19 | [A] - Hermjakob Ulf ET AL, "Knowledge-Based Question Answering", (20020714), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://citeseerx.ist.psu.edu/viewdoc/download?doi=10.1.1.85.7376&rep=rep1&type=pdf, (20220223), XP055894890 [A] 3-6 * figure 1 * * section 2 * | International search | [A]CN101437018 (INVENTEC CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]CN102667765 (NOKIA CORP) [Y] 1-10 * description, paragraphs 31-97 *; | [A]CN103493045 (GOOGLE INC) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]CN105592082 (BEIJING WEIBOYI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-2, 7, 9-10 * description, paragraphs 5-98 *; | [A]CN106663130 (SHENZHEN GOWILD INTELLIGENT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [Y]CN106844506 (EMOTIBOT TECH LTD) [Y] 3-6, 8-10 * description, paragraphs 33-49 *; | [A]US2018025726 (GATTI DE BAYSER MAIRA [BR], et al) [A] 1-10* entire document *; | [A]CN107767253 (SHANDONG INSPUR BUSINESS SYSTEM CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * entire document *; | [PX]CN108763494 (AI SPEECH LTD) [PX] 1-10 * claims 1-10 * |