EP3802424 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAKING BORON OXIDE NANOPARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.06.2023 [2023/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Roshini 7511 Hampton Avenue West Hollywood, CA 90046 / US | 02 /
LOGAN, Jessica, Kate 600 Charles E. Young Drive Los Angeles, CA 90095 / US | 03 /
SPOKOYNY, Alexander, M. 236 N. Kenter Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | [2021/22] |
Former [2021/15] | 01 /
RAMACHANDRAN, Roshini 7511 Hampton Avenue West Hollywood, CA 90046 / US | ||
02 /
LOGAN, Jessica, Kate 1380 Veteran Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US | |||
03 /
SPOKOYNY, Alexander, M. 236 N. Kenter Avenue Los Angeles, CA 90049 / US | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19811972.9 | 31.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019US34817 | Priority number, date | US201862679069P | 01.06.2018 Original published format: US 201862679069 P | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019232312 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3802424 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C01B35/10, A61K41/00 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
C01B35/1027 (EP,US);
A61K41/0095 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (US);
B82Y40/00 (US);
C01P2004/32 (US);
C01P2004/64 (US)
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | C01B35/10, C01B35/00, C07F5/00, C07F5/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BOROXID-NANOPARTIKELN | [2021/15] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MAKING BORON OXIDE NANOPARTICLES | [2021/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE NANOPARTICULES D'OXYDE DE BORE | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 03.01.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/23] | 25.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN1438176 (GUO SHUIHU [CN]) [A] 1-19 * claims 1-5 *; | [XAI]US2008224104 (ZABAN ARIE [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * examples 1-5; claims 1-12 * [A] 3,5-14 [I] 15-19; | [A]WO2010124245 (UNIV UTAH RES FOUND [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * page 28, line 8 - page 30, line 32; claims 1-31 *; | [A] - NEDUNCHEZHIAN KAVITAA, "Boron Neutron Capture Therapy - A Literature Review", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL AND DIAGNOSTIC RESEARCH, doi:10.7860/JCDR/2016/19890.9024, ISSN 2249-782X, (20160101), URL: https://jcdr.net/articles/PDF/9024/19890_CE¢NE!_F(Sh)_PF1(VSUAK)_PFA(AK)_PF2(EKAK).pdf, XP055796226 [A] 15-19 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, column 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7860/JCDR/2016/19890.9024 | [A] - ZHU YINGHUAI ET AL, "Nanostructured boron compounds for cancer therapy", PURE & APPLIED CHEMISTRY, GB, vol. 90, no. 4, doi:10.1515/pac-2017-0903, ISSN 0033-4545, (20180401), pages 653 - 663, URL: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/pac-2017-0903, XP055879139 [A] 15-19 * page 653, paragraph 2 - page 656, paragraph 2 * * page 661, paragraph 2 - page 662, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1515/pac-2017-0903 | International search | [Y]WO9962079 (UNIV BAR ILAN [IL], et al) [Y] 33 * entire document *; | [Y]CN1438176 (GUO SHUIHU [CN]) [Y] 2, 29-34 * see machine translation *; | [XY]US2008224104 (ZABAN ARIE [IL], et al) [X] 1 * entire document * [Y] 2, 5-8, 12-14, 29-34; | [Y]US2010069229 (YANG SHIHE [CN], et al) [Y] 5, 6, 30-32 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013004412 (IYER SIVASANKARAN SANKARANARAYANA [IN]) [Y] 12-14 * entire document *; | [Y]US2014322823 (ALOCILJA EVANGELYN C [US], et al) [Y] 7, 8 * entire document *; | [PX] - RAMACHANDRAN et al., "Sonochemical Synthesis of Small Boron Oxide Nanoparticles", Inorganic Chemistry, (20180716), vol. 57, no. 14, XP055659400 [PX] 1-14, 29-34 * , entire document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acs.inorgchem.8b01189 |