EP3810109 - COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INHIBITING CD73 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/17] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INHIBITING CD73 | ||
[2024/11] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peloton Therapeutics, Inc. 2330 Inwood Road Suite 226 Dallas, TX 75235-7323 / US | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Bin 2330 Inwood Road, Suite 226 Dallas, Texas 75235-7323 / US | 02 /
YANG, Hanbiao 2330 Inwood Road, Suite 226 Dallas, Texas 75235-7323 / US | 03 /
BEDKE, Karl 2330 Inwood Road, Suite 226 Dallas, Texas 75235-7323 / US | 04 /
RIZZI, James P. 2330 Inwood Road, Suite 226 Dallas, Texas 75235-7323 / US | 05 /
HUANG, Heli 2330 Inwood Road, Suite 226 Dallas, Texas 75235-7323 / US | 06 /
WANG, Keshi 2330 Inwood Road, Suite 226 Dallas, Texas 75235-7323 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [2024/32] |
Former [2021/17] | Jaap, David Robert, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | Application number, filing date | 19812076.8 | 31.05.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US34826 | Priority number, date | US201862678862P | 31.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862678862 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019232319 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3810109 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3810109 | Date: | 07.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K45/06, A61K39/00, A61P35/00, C07H19/14, C07H19/04, C07K16/28 | [2024/11] | CPC: |
A61K39/39541 (EP);
C07F9/6561 (US);
A61K31/675 (US);
A61K31/685 (US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US);
C07F9/6571 (US);
C07H19/04 (EP);
C07H19/14 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K39/39541, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | A61K31/115, A61K31/13, A61K31/662, C07D473/34, C07K16/28, C07K16/40, A61P35/00 | ||
Former IPC [2021/17] | A61K31/115, A61K31/13, A61K31/662, C07D473/34, C07K16/28, C07K16/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGEN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HEMMUNG VON CD73 | [2024/11] | English: | COMPOUNDS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR INHIBITING CD73 | [2024/11] | French: | COMPOSÉS ET COMPOSITIONS POUR L'INHIBITION DE CD73 | [2024/11] |
Former [2021/17] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG VON CD73 | ||
Former [2021/17] | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR INHIBITING CD73 | ||
Former [2021/17] | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS D'INHIBITION DE CD73 | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2021 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2021 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 12.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.12.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 21.12.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010204182 (MUELLER CHRISTA E [DE], et al); | [A]WO2015164573 (VITAE PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US]); | [A]US2017218001 (MAGUIRE ANITA [IE], et al) | by applicant | US4932412 | US5811097 | WO9842752 | US5855887 | US5977318 | US6051227 | WO0037504 | WO0114424 | US6207156 | WO0124684 | US2002039581 | EP1212422 | US2002086014 | US6682736 | WO2004035607 | WO2004056875 | US2005201994 | US6984720 | US7109003 | US7132281 | WO2006121168 | WO2007005874 | WO2008156712 | WO2009014708 | US7488802 | US7521051 | WO2009101611 | WO2009114335 | US7595048 | US7605238 | WO2010027827 | WO2010036959 | US7722868 | WO2010077634 | WO2010089411 | US7794710 | WO2011066342 | US8008449 | US8143379 | WO2012145493 | US8318916 | US8354509 | WO2013019906 | US8383796 | US8435516 | WO2013181452 | WO2014022758 | US8652465 | US8735553 | WO2014100079 | US2014199334 | US8784815 | US2014294898 | US8883984 | WO2014206107 | US2015071910 | WO2015033301 | WO2015033299 | WO2015033303 | WO2015036394 | WO2015036927 | WO2015035606 | WO2015048520 | WO2015044900 | WO2015061668 | WO2015085847 | WO2015109124 | WO2015112900 | WO2015112805 | WO2015112800 | WO2015164573 | WO2016039749 | WO2016077518 | WO2016100608 | WO2016126646 | WO2016142852 | WO2016142894 | WO2016142886 | WO2016142833 | WO2016142835 | US2016340391 | WO2017066227 | US2017107216 | WO2017070089 | WO2017106634 | US2017174679 | WO2017118762 | US2017252432 | WO2017176608 | WO2017192961 | WO2017202275 | WO2017202273 | WO2017202276 | WO2017205464 | US2017362253 | WO2018005374 | WO2018009505 | WO2018006795 | WO2018013789 | WO2018026971 | US2018057486 | WO2018044963 | WO2018045142 | WO2018051255 | WO2018051254 |