EP3805981 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PLANNING OPERATION IN TARGET REGION, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2023 [2023/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guangzhou Xaircraft Technology Co., Ltd Bldg.C, 115 Gaopu Rd. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAI, Shuangliang Bldg. C, 115 Gaopu Rd. Tianhe District Guangzhou Guangdong 510000 / CN | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Penza, Giancarlo, et al Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2021/15] | Penza, Giancarlo Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 19812180.8 | 16.01.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019CN71998 | Priority number, date | CN201810525552 | 28.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810525552 | [2021/15] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019227948 | Date: | 05.12.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3805981 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/62 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
G06Q10/047 (EP,US);
G06V20/13 (CN);
A01B79/005 (EP);
G01C21/343 (US);
G06F18/2413 (EP);
G06F18/24137 (US);
G06N3/045 (EP,CN);
G06Q10/06312 (CN);
G06Q50/02 (EP,CN);
G06V10/457 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/15] | G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR PLANUNG DES BETRIEBS IN EINER ZIELREGION, SPEICHERMEDIUM UND PROZESSOR | [2021/15] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PLANNING OPERATION IN TARGET REGION, STORAGE MEDIUM, AND PROCESSOR | [2021/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR PLANIFIER UNE OPÉRATION DANS UNE ZONE CIBLE, SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE, ET PROCESSEUR | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2020 | Translation filed | 25.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 12.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.08.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/52] | 23.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2023 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CN106873631 (XAIRCRAFT CO LTD) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0214]; figures 1-9 *; | [A]CN107264806 (SUZHOU EAVISION ROBOT TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0026]; figures 1-4 * | International search | [X]CN105116911 (XAIRCRAFT CO LTD) [X] 1-5, 8-14, 17-20 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]CN107390715 (SHENZHEN HUAHU TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]CN107450576 (UNIV HARBIN ENG) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [PX]CN108846325 (XAIRCRAFT CO LTD) [PX] 1-20* entire document * |