EP3894784 - METHOD FOR MEASURING GEOMETRIC DISCREPANCIES BETWEEN THE CURVED SURFACES OF A PLURALITY OF MATERIALS THAT ARE TO BE EVALUATED AND A CURVED SURFACE OF A REFERENCE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.09.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.06.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 12 Place de l'Iris Tour Saint-Gobain 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2021/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLU, Adrien 37 rue Croix Saint-Firmin 80090 AMIENS / FR | 02 /
MARLIER, Alexandre 34 Allée de la Croix Bécart 60400 PONTOISE LES NOYON / FR | [2021/42] | Representative(s) | Saint-Gobain Recherche B.P. 135 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [2021/42] | Application number, filing date | 19813550.1 | 06.12.2019 | [2021/42] | WO2019EP83920 | Priority number, date | FR20180072770 | 12.12.2018 Original published format: FR 1872770 | [2021/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020120294 | Date: | 18.06.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3894784 | Date: | 20.10.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/24, G01B11/30, G01B21/04, G01N21/958, B25J9/16 | [2021/42] | CPC: |
G01B11/24 (EP,KR,RU,US);
B25J9/16 (KR,RU);
B25J17/0283 (US);
G01B11/30 (EP,KR,RU);
G01B21/04 (RU);
G01B21/042 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/42] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON GEOMETRISCHEN ABWEICHUNGEN ZWISCHEN DEN GEKRÜMMTEN OBERFLÄCHEN EINER VIELZAHL VON ZU BEURTEILENDEN MATERIALIEN UND EINE GEKRÜMMTE OBERFLÄCHE EINES REFERENZMATERIALS | [2021/42] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING GEOMETRIC DISCREPANCIES BETWEEN THE CURVED SURFACES OF A PLURALITY OF MATERIALS THAT ARE TO BE EVALUATED AND A CURVED SURFACE OF A REFERENCE MATERIAL | [2021/42] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE DES ECARTS GEOMETRIQUES ENTRE LES SURFACES INCURVEES D'UNE PLURALITE DE MATÉRIAUX À ÉVALUER ET UNE SURFACE INCURVEE D'UN MATERIAU DE REFERENCE | [2021/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2021 | Examination requested [2021/42] | 12.07.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0453433 (CENTRE RECH METALLURGIQUE [BE]) [Y] 1-17 * abstract ** column 2, line 42 - column 4, line 44 *; | [Y]US5426861 (SHELTON RUSSELL S [US]) [Y] 1-11,13,15,16 * abstract * * figures 2,3 * * column 2, lines 3-32 * * column 4, line 33 - column 10, line 37 *; | [Y]JPH09257657 (HIMU KENKYUSHO KK) [Y] 9,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0020] - [0023] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1176388 (DUERR SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-17 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0020] * * claims 1-4,11,12,14 *; | [Y]DE102006016677 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [Y] 3,4,9-11,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0005] , [0006] , [0008] , [0009] - [0012] - [0014] , [0016] , [0024] , [0026] , [0027] , [0029] , [0033] * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2016052248 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO [JP]) [Y] 8,16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] - [0027] - [0033] * | by applicant | US3733704 | US4221053 | GB2152210 | US4679331 | EP0342127 | EP0463940 | WO9817993 | EP1061357 |