EP3804079 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING INTERCONNECTED AND SECURE MOBILE DEVICE CHARGING STATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.03.2021 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHARGEITSPOT, LLC 111 South Independence Mail East Suite 810 Philadelphia, PA 19106 / US | [2021/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDASARE, Douglas 335 S 12th Street Unit 3A Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19107 / US | 02 /
HORSTMANN, Jens 3633 Vireo Ave. Santa Clara, California 95051 / US | 03 /
KAY, Robert 11 S Forklanding Rd Cinnaminson, New Jersey 08077 / US | 04 /
NOLAN, Colin 907 A Spring Mill Ave Conshohocken, Pennsylvania 19428 / US | 05 /
PONDO, Beth 21/10 Hardie St. Darlinghorst, New South Wales 7010 / AU | 06 /
TATE, Sheri 2212 Mt. Vernon Street Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19130 / US | [2021/15] | Representative(s) | Bates, Daniel Joseph Ogive Intellectual Property Ltd 34 Westgate North Cave Brough HU15 2NJ / GB | [2021/15] | Application number, filing date | 19814049.3 | 22.05.2019 | [2021/15] | WO2019US33500 | Priority number, date | US201815996956 | 04.06.2018 Original published format: US201815996956 | [2021/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019236293 | Date: | 12.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3804079 | Date: | 14.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.12.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
H02J7/00034 (EP);
H02J7/00045 (EP);
H02J7/0013 (EP);
H02J7/0042 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/15] | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON MITEINANDER VERBUNDENEN UND SICHEREN LADESTATIONEN FÜR MOBILE VORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/15] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING INTERCONNECTED AND SECURE MOBILE DEVICE CHARGING STATIONS | [2021/15] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE DE STATIONS DE CHARGE DE DISPOSITIFS MOBILES INTERCONNECTÉES ET SÉCURISÉES | [2021/15] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/15] | 22.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003230229 (COPCOM CO LTD) [A] 1,8* abstract *; | [A]US2013132307 (PHELPS JACK STANDISH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0027] *; | [A]WO2013140213 (ECONET WIRELESS IP HOLDINGS LTD [MU], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016165443 (BALDASARE DOUGLAS [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraphs [0044] - [0048] - [0052] *; | [A]US2020295582 (VELDERMAN MATTHEW J [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0083] * | International search | [Y]US2013252577 (JORDAN COLIN STEPHEN [ZA]) [Y] 1-15 * , entire document, especially para [0006]; [0007]; [0015]; [0021]; [0057]; [0058]; [0061]; [0078] *; | [Y]US2013254123 (MULLIN JAMES [US], et al) [Y] 1-15* , entire document, especially Fig. 8; para [0013]; [0015]; [0021]; [0025-0027]; [0029]; [0035]; [0038] * | by applicant | JP2003230229 | US2013132307 | WO2013140213 | US2016165443 | US2020295582 |